Dabney et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: David B. Dabney and Nancy A. Dabney
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2018cv00483
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. The deadline for defendant to file an answer is stayed pending the appropriation of funds for defendant so as to enable Department of Justice attorneys to resume civil litigation functions. The Government must file an appropriate motion to lift the stay. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 12/27/2018. (tgw)
December 27, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint in Light of Lapse of Appropriations to Judge Steele (tgw)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Barry, Joanna)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by David B. Dabney, Nancy A. Dabney of Return of Service on the US Attorney via the Civil Process Clerk (Levin, Michelle)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by David B. Dabney, Nancy A. Dabney of Return of Service on the Internal Revenue Service (Levin, Michelle)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David B. Dabney, Nancy A. Dabney. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Levin, Michelle)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 11/16/2018. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 12/31/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 11/16/2018. (tgw)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney's Office & U.S. Attorney General. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2307629, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by David B. Dabney, Nancy A. Dabney. (Levin, Michelle) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dabney et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B. Dabney
Represented By: David M. Wooldridge
Represented By: Michelle Abroms Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy A. Dabney
Represented By: David M. Wooldridge
Represented By: Michelle Abroms Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joanna Lynne Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?