University of South Alabama v. Lytle, et al
Plaintiff: University of South Alabama
Defendant: Jonathan James Lytle
3Rd Party Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: USAA General Indemnity Company
Counter Defendant: USA Health
Case Number: 1:2018cv00500
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Counterclaim by USA Health. by USA Health. (Boller, Thomas) Modified on 1/23/2019 (tot).
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #11 filed by O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #10 filed by USAA General Indemnity Company (Cassady, William)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Third Party Defendants O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., O'Reilly Auto Parts identifying Other Affiliate O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Other Affiliate O'Reilly Auto Parts for O'Reilly Automotive, Inc... (Killion, Emily)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association identifying Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for USAA General Indemnity Company.. (Murray, Christopher)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order, University of South Alabama is to file its response to the Counterclaim (filed in the Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, on 10/29/18) on or before 1/22/2019 or show cause why it has failed to comply w/FRCP 12(a). Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/8/19. (tot)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/8/19. (Attachment: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge) (tot)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order GRANTING USAA's Motion to Strike Pursuant to Alabama Rules of Civil Procedure 5.1 filed in the Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama as set out. The Clerk shall strike the requested document from the record. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/7/19. (tot)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order, USAA General Indemnity Company & O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., shall file their individual disclosure statements on or before 1/14/2019, or SHOW CAUSE why they have failed to comply w/Civil L.R. 7.1. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/7/19. (Attachment: #1 Blank Disclosure Statement Form) (tot)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Jason Ruiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/7/19. (tot)
December 13, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Jason Ruiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2319413, Online Credit Card Payment.) with application and certificate of good standing attached; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Jason Ruiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2319413, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Jonathan James Lytle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Ruiz, Jason)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. (Notice of Filing Notice of Removal filed in Mobile County Circuit Court) (Killion, Emily)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.. (Killion, Emily)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number CV-2017-903314. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-2312458, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Circuit Court file)) (Killion, Emily) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot). (Additional attachment added on 1/8/2019: #3 Exhibit A (State Court File) w/Stricken Exhibit-See Doc. #7 (tot). Modified on 1/8/2019 (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: University of South Alabama v. Lytle, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Emily C. Killion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of South Alabama
Represented By: Thomas R. Boller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan James Lytle
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Canon
Represented By: Jason Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Christopher Howell Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: USA Health
Represented By: Thomas R. Boller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?