Stanley v. Richardson et al

Plaintiff: Kelly M. Stanley
Defendant: LRS Solutions, Inc. and Theotis O. Richardson
Case Number: 1:2018cv00508
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 REFERRAL OF #9 Reply to Response to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Judge Murray. (nah)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion #6 filed by Kelly M. Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Hospital Lien and Subro Letters, #3 Exhibit Email Correspondence) (Colvin, Alan)
January 9, 2019 REFERRAL OF #8 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to Judge Murray. (nah)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by LRS Solutions, Inc., Theotis O. Richardson. (Hale, Justin)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #6 MOTION to Remand. Defendants responses due by 1/9/2019, Plaintiff reply due by 1/16/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on 1/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/20/2018. (nah)
December 19, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Remand - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Kelly M. Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Colvin, Alan) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/19/2018) (nah).
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by LRS Solutions, Inc., Theotis O. Richardson. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by LRS Solutions, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/07/2018. (nah)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/06/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants LRS Solutions, Inc., Theotis O. Richardson. (Hale, Justin)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Theotis O. Richardson, LRS Solutions, Inc. from Mobile County Circuit Court, case number 2018-902513. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-2315504, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by Theotis O. Richardson, LRS Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplement Certificate of Removal) (Hale, Justin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2018: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Richardson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LRS Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: John Kevin Pocus
Represented By: Justin Isaac Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theotis O. Richardson
Represented By: John Kevin Pocus
Represented By: Justin Isaac Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly M. Stanley
Represented By: Alan Matthew Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?