Collins v. City of Mobile, Alabama
Plaintiff: John E. Collins, Jr.
Defendant: City of Mobile, Alabama
Case Number: 1:2018cv00511
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certified Mail by John E. Collins, Jr. City of Mobile, Alabama served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Postal Service Tracking Report) (Williams, Ronnie)
January 23, 2019 REFERRAL OF #5 Notice of Service Status to Judge Moorer. (tot)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service Status by John E. Collins, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit US Postal Service Tracking Report) (Williams, Ronnie) Modified on 1/23/2019 (tot).
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Terry F. Moorer and Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To ensure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 12/11/2018. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 1/21/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/11/2018. (srd)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John E. Collins, Jr. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Mobile, Alabama ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2316757, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by John E. Collins, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons) (Williams, Ronnie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mpp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. City of Mobile, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mobile, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Collins, Jr.
Represented By: Ronnie L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?