Jones v. Gordy

Petitioner: Taveres Dishan Jones
Respondent: Christopher Gordy
Case Number: 1:2018cv00526
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Petitioner to pay the required filing fee or file a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees by 2/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 02/04/2019. (Copy of order & IFP form mailed to Petitioner) (nah)
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Status by Taveres Dishan Jones - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU) (tgw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Taveres Dishan Jones - Ref to MJ/Bivins (PSU) (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Gordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Gordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Taveres Dishan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?