Shark Tech, LLC v. Transportation Services of St. John, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shark Tech, LLC
Defendant: Caribe Time, Transportation Services of St. John, Inc. and Caribe Cay
Case Number: 1:2019cv00032
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice as to #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 03/06/2019. (srd)
February 28, 2019 REFERRAL OF #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to Judge Steele. (tgw)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (maples, Aaron)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT of for Arrest issued as to the Vessel Caribe Time (2 copies to USM for service) (tgw) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/25/2019) (tgw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #1 USM Ret.) (srd).
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT of for Arrest issued as to the Vessel Caribe Cay (2 copies to USM for service) (tgw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #1 USM Ret.) (srd).
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Issuance of Warrant of Arrest. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/25/2019. (tgw)
January 25, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Order of Arrest of the Caribe Cay and Caribe Time to Judge Steele (tgw)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order of Arrest of the Caribe Cay and Caribe Time by Shark Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Warrant for Arrest of Caribe Time, #3 Exhibit Warrant for Arrest of Caribe Cay) (maples, Aaron)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2338268, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (maples, Aaron) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shark Tech, LLC v. Transportation Services of St. John, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribe Time
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Services of St. John, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribe Cay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shark Tech, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Nicholas maples
Represented By: Shawn Tavel Alves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?