Begley et al v. Golden et al

Plaintiff: Erin Begley and Blake Lee
Defendant: Executive Park Services, Inc., Employee Liability Management, Inc., Matthew Golden, Loda Bier Garten, Inc. and Poinciana Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00056
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Referred to Judge William H. Steele. (skb)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas O. Gaillard, III on behalf of Employee Liability Management, Inc., Executive Park Services, Inc. (Gaillard, Thomas)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed jointly by all Defendants by Matthew Golden, Loda Bier Garten, Inc., Poinciana Holdings, LLC. (Peake, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Employee Liability Management, Inc., Executive Park Services, Inc., Matthew Golden, Loda Bier Garten, Inc., Poinciana Holdings, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Service Order entered 2/13/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 3/28/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 2/13/2019. (tgw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2348012, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Poinciana Secretary of State Page, #2 Exhibit Loda bier Garten Secretary of State, #3 Exhibit Justia Trademark Details, #4 Exhibit EPS Secretary of State Page, #5 Exhibit EPS DOL Registration, #6 Exhibit ELM Secretary of State Page, #7 Exhibit Employee Handbook, #8 Exhibit Paycheck Redacted, #9 Exhibit Loda Homepage) (Arciniegas, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2019: #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Begley et al v. Golden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Begley
Represented By: Daniel Eduardo Arciniegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Lee
Represented By: Daniel Eduardo Arciniegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Park Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas O. Gaillard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employee Liability Management, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas O. Gaillard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Golden
Represented By: John Day Peake, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loda Bier Garten, Inc.
Represented By: John Day Peake, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poinciana Holdings, LLC
Represented By: John Day Peake, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?