Kimbrough v. Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Kimbrough
Defendant: Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH and Ronald Green
Case Number: 1:2019cv00059
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order re: #13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH, ( Scheduling Conference, by telephone, set for 4/11/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/3/2019. (eec)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Ronald Kimbrough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Dunson, Kendall)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Morrissette, Henry)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #11 filed by Ronald Kimbrough (Cassady, William)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Ronald Kimbrough. (Dunson, Kendall)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Notice of Removal,, [Amended and/or Supplemental Notice of Removal] by Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Morrissette, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 filed by Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH (Cassady, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH, EuroPipe GmbH, Salzgitter Mannesmann GmbH, AG der Dillinger Huttenwerke, Salgitter AG, Dillinger Hutte Saarstahl AG identifying Corporate Parent EuroPipe GmbH, Other Affiliate Salzgitter Mannesmann GmbH, Other Affiliate AG der Dillinger Huttenwerke, Other Affiliate Salgitter AG, Other Affiliate Dillinger Hutte Saarstahl AG for Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH.. (Morrissette, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/19/2019. (eec)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint [Answer to Second Amended Complaint] by Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH. (Morrissette, Henry)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH re #2 Notice of Removal,, #3 MOTION to Supplement Notice of Removal [Notice of Certificate of Service on Chase Davis of Green & Phillips] (Morrissette, Henry)
February 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Supplement Notice of Removal. Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (eec)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
February 11, 2019 Remark: Notice [Notice of Removal] was inadvertently filed using the incorrect event by Defendant Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH. Refer to Doc. 2 - Notice of Removal. (eec)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Supplement Notice of Removal by Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E) (Morrissette, Henry)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH from Mobile County Circuit Court, case number 02-cv-2018-900546. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-2347225, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1, #2 Exhibit A, Part 2, #3 Exhibit A, Part 3, #4 Exhibit A, Part 4, #5 Exhibit A, Part 5, #6 Exhibit A, Part 6, #7 Exhibit A, Part 7, #8 Exhibit A, Part 8, #9 Exhibit A, Part 9, #10 Exhibit Part 10) (Morrissette, Henry) : #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE by Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH [Notice of Removal] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1) (Morrissette, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimbrough v. Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulheim Pipe Coatings GmbH
Represented By: Henry T. Morrissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Kimbrough
Represented By: Kendall C. Dunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?