Dixon v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jeremy William Dixon
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00060
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. The Motion to Remand will come before the Court during the Scheduling Conference, presently set for a telephone conference on 4/11/2019, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/4/2019. (eec)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (McKenna, Dennis)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re: #5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, ( Scheduling Conference, by telephone, set for 4/11/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/28/2019. (eec)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (McKenna, Dennis)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/11/2019. (eec)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Savarese, Steven)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number CV-2019-900072. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-2347176, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Savarese, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Paul Savarese, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis Patrick McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy William Dixon
Represented By: Richard H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?