Union Security Insurance Company v. Davison et al
Plaintiff: Union Security Insurance Company
Defendant: Lisa Davison and L. T. Holt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00061
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss (Motion to Interplead Funds) by Union Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Yeilding, Christopher)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Lisa Davison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit "2" Beneficiary Designation Form, #3 Exhibit "3" Judgment of Final Divorce) (Watkins, Jason)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against L. T. Holt by Lisa Davison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit "2" Beneficiary Designation Form, #3 Exhibit "3" Judgment of Final Divorce) (Watkins, Jason)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Lisa Davison by L. T. Holt. (Powers, Glenmore)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenmore Patrick Powers on behalf of L. T. Holt (Powers, Glenmore)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Watkins on behalf of Lisa Davison (Watkins, Jason)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed 2/25/19 by Union Security Insurance Company. L. T. Holt served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019 (Yeilding, Christopher)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed 2/25/19 by Union Security Insurance Company. Lisa Davison served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019 (Yeilding, Christopher)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Union Security Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 02/15/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Union Security Insurance Company. (Steele, William)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Union Security Insurance Company. (Yeilding, Christopher)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER [TEXT ONLY]: Union Security Insurance Company is ORDERED to file a Disclosure Statement in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (applicable to "nongovernmental corporate" parties) and/or S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Wed. 2/20/2019 (form available at: www.alsd.uscourts.gov/sites/alsd/files/forms/CivilDisclosureStatement.pdf). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/13/2019. (ctn)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 2/12/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 3/28/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 2/12/2019. (tgw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lisa Davison, L. T. Holt. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Union Security Insurance Company (Yeilding, Christopher) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/12/2019) (tgw).
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2347525, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Union Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Yeilding, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2019: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Security Insurance Company v. Davison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Davison
Represented By: Jason R. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. T. Holt
Represented By: Glenmore Patrick Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Lynch Yeilding
Represented By: Robert Vance Baxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?