Houston v. PCH Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Reginald C. Houston
Defendant: PCH Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00064
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reginald C. Houston. PCH Hotels & Resorts, Inc. served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019 (Williams, Ronnie)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Reginald C. Houston re #3 Service Order (Williams, Ronnie)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 2/13/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 3/29/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 2/13/2019. (tgw)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PCH Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PCH Hotels & Resorts, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2349105, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Reginald C. Houston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons) (Williams, Ronnie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. PCH Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald C. Houston
Represented By: Ronnie L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCH Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?