Golston v. Ford Motor Company et al

Plaintiff: Tiffany Golston
Defendant: Takata Corporation, Ford Motor Company and TK Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00067
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order setting a Scheduling Conference for 4/25/2019 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Out-of-town counsel may attend by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/12/2019. (tgw)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Response Deadline re: #5 MOTION for Protective Order for Preservation of Vehicle filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company and #6 MOTION for Protective Order in compliance with HIPAA filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Plaintiff's Responses to these motions are due on or before 4/25/2019. Defendant's Replies, if any, are due on or before 5/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/12/19. (lto)
April 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Protective Order for Preservation of Vehicle & #6 MOTION for Protective Order re: HIPAA Compliance - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (tgw)
April 12, 2019 REFERRAL OF #4 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Murray. (tgw)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Protective Order re: HIPAA Compliance by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Thomas, D.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Protective Order for Preservation of Vehicle by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Thomas, D.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Thomas, D.)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 2/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. (Thomas, D.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number 02-CV-2019-900001. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-2351367, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix State Court File) (Thomas, D.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golston v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takata Corporation
Represented By: Paul Frederich Malek
Represented By: D. Alan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Paul Frederich Malek
Represented By: D. Alan Thomas
Represented By: Rudolph Woods Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Frederich Malek
Represented By: D. Alan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Golston
Represented By: Larry C. Moorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?