Peeples v. Xlibris Publishing
Plaintiff: Mario Andjuan Peeples
Defendant: Xlibris Publishing
Case Number: 1:2019cv00070
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is recommended that the Court deny the amended IFP motion (Doc. 6) and dismiss this case without prejudice, prior to service of process, for failure to establish diversity jurisdiction & failure to state a claim for copyright infringement. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/8/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario Andjuan Peeples - Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (tgw)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Amended COMPLAINT against Xlibris Publishing filed by Mario Andjuan Peeples. (tgw)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint & either pay the $400 filing fee or file a new IFP motion by 3/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/22/2019. Copy of Order & IFP motion mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of defendant's address for service by Mario Andjuan Peeples (tgw)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario Andjuan Peeples - Referred to Judge William E. Cassady (PSU). (nah)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xlibris Publishing, filed by Mario Andjuan Peeples - Ref to MJ/Cassady (PSU). (nah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peeples v. Xlibris Publishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Andjuan Peeples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xlibris Publishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?