Western Alliance Tubulars, Ltd. v. M/V BBC Ontario et al
Plaintiff: Western Alliance Tubulars, Ltd.
Defendant: M/V BBC Ontario, BBC Chartering Carriers GMBH & Co.KG, Graf Edzard KG and Krey Schiffahrts GMBH & Co., KG
Undetermined: U.S. Maritime Security, LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, General Electric International, Inc, GE Energy Products France SNC and General Electric Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00076
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:741
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 20 ***Case Transfer Confirmation. Case received and opened in Southern District of Texas, Case Number 4:19-cv-01399. (skb)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Transfer Venue. It is ORDERED that this lawsuit be transferred from the USDC for the Southern District of Alabama, Southern Division, to the USDC for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 04/17/2019. (nah)
March 25, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Venue to Judge Beaverstock. (srd)
March 25, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Venue by Western Alliance Tubulars, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Crutchfield, Blane)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER re: #16 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. The Court notes Intervenor-Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice (Doc. 16), which is made pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Intervenor-Plaintiffs' Complaint-in-Intervention (Doc. 8) is dismissed without prejudice by operation of that Rule. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 03/11/2019. (jil)
March 8, 2019 REFERRAL OF #16 Stipulation of Dismissal to Judge Beaverstock. (tgw)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Intervenor Plaintiffs Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America (Crutchfield, Blane)
March 1, 2019 REFERRAL OF #14 & #15 Consent for Release of Vessel to Judge Beaverstock. (tgw) Modified on 3/7/2019 (tgw).
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 Consent for Release of Vessel filed by Plaintiff Western Alliance Tubulars, Ltd. (Crutchfield, Blane) Modified on 3/7/2019 (tgw).
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 Consent for Release of Vessel filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs GE Energy Products France SNC, General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America (Crutchfield, Blane) Modified on 3/7/2019 (tgw).
February 23, 2019 Filing 13 Writ of Attachment and Garnishment issued by Clerk and delivered to U.S. Marshal. Hearing on Writ of Attachment and Garnishment set for 3/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. (jlr)
February 23, 2019 Filing 12 WARRANT to Seize Vessel in Rem issued by Clerk and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service. (jlr)
February 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Authorizing #10 Warrant of Arrest and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment as further set out. Hearing on Writ of Attachment and Garnishment set for 3/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 2/23/2019. Certified copies delivered to the U.S. Marshal. (jlr)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem , MOTION for Writ of Attachment , MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by GE Energy Products France SNC, General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warrant, #2 Exhibit Writ of Attachment and Garnishment, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Crutchfield, Blane)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by GE Energy Products France SNC, General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America re #8 Intervenor Complaint, of Declaration in Support of Verified Complaint in Intervention (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration) (Crutchfield, Blane)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, GE Energy Products France SNC, General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to the Complaint) (Crutchfield, Blane)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM-285 served 2/20/2019 as to M/V BBC Ontario (skb)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Custodian U.S. Maritime Security, LLC as Substitute Custodian. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 2/20/2019. (jlr)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant of Seizure. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 2/20/2019. (jlr)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian by Western Alliance Tubulars, Ltd.. (Crutchfield, Blane)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Western Alliance Tubulars, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Seize, #2 Exhibit Warrant to Seize) (Crutchfield, Blane)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BBC Chartering Carriers GMBH & Co.KG, Graf Edzard KG, Krey Schiffahrts GMBH & Co., KG, M/V BBC Ontario ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2355017, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Western Alliance Tubulars, Ltd.. (Crutchfield, Blane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Alliance Tubulars, Ltd. v. M/V BBC Ontario et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V BBC Ontario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBC Chartering Carriers GMBH & Co.KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graf Edzard KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krey Schiffahrts GMBH & Co., KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Alliance Tubulars, Ltd.
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: U.S. Maritime Security, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: General Electric International, Inc
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: GE Energy Products France SNC
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: General Electric Company
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?