Evanston Insurance Company v. Mega Construction Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Defendant: Mega Construction Company, Inc., Jesus Galarza and Joshua P. Myrick
Case Number: 1:2019cv00081
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 24 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #23 filed by Defendant Joshua P. Myrick reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
April 12, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Joshua P. Myrick. (Morris, Joseph)
April 12, 2019 Filing 22 Documents endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statements #20 filed by Defendant Jesus Galaraza and #21 filed by Defendant Mega Construction Company, Inc. reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Mega Construction Company, Inc.. (Mosholder, Brian)
April 11, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Jesus Galarza. (Mosholder, Brian)
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendant Mega Construction Company, Inc.; Disclosure Statement Due 4/12/2019. (tot)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/5/19. (Attachment: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge) (tot)
April 3, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Jesus Galarza, Mega Construction Company, Inc.. (Mosholder, Brian)
April 2, 2019 Filing 16 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Terry F. Moorer. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Joshua P. Myrick. (Morris, Joseph)
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Matthew Graczyk on behalf of Evanston Insurance Company (Graczyk, Joel)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody Moon on behalf of Evanston Insurance Company (Moon, Cody)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cody S. Moon, as amended #10 . Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/21/19. (lto)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion to Amend/Correct #7 the Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Cody S. Moon. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/21/19. (lto)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to correct application for admission for Cody S. Moon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Evanston Insurance Company. (Donaldson, Michael) Modified on 3/21/2019 (lto).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Joel M. Graczyk. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/20/19. (lto)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Joel W. Graczyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2371433, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Evanston Insurance Company. (Donaldson, Michael)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Cody S. Moon to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2371431, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Evanston Insurance Company. (Donaldson, Michael)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evanston Insurance Company. Joshua P. Myrick served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019 (Donaldson, Michael)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evanston Insurance Company. Jesus Galarza served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019 (Donaldson, Michael)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evanston Insurance Company. Mega Construction Company, Inc. served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019 (Donaldson, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jesus Galarza, Mega Construction Company, Inc., Joshua P. Myrick. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2356802, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Summons Galarza, #10 Exhibit Summons Myrick, #11 Exhibit Summons Mega) (Donaldson, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2019: #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. Mega Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mega Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Taggart Mosholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Galarza
Represented By: Brian Taggart Mosholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua P. Myrick
Represented By: Joseph A. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A Donaldson
Represented By: Cody Moon
Represented By: Joel Matthew Graczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?