Likely v. Homestead Hospice & Palliative Care
Plaintiff: Lyndia Likely
Defendant: Homestead Hospice & Palliative Care
Case Number: 1:2019cv00085
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lyndia Likely. (Shinbaum, Kenneth)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 2/28/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 4/8/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 2/28/2019. (tgw)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Homestead Hospice & Palliative Care. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lyndia Likely ( Filing fee $400 receipt number BALSDC-2357361, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Lyndia Likely. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shinbaum, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Likely v. Homestead Hospice & Palliative Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndia Likely
Represented By: Julian L. McPhillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homestead Hospice & Palliative Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?