Bullard et al v. The Housing Authority of the City of Monroeville, Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Jessica McKinley, Sharanda Stallworth, Alice Dale, Casandra Mills, Yolander Bullard, Gracie McMillian, Keiyauna Kyles, Jasmin Foster, Shawanda Lett, Whitney Allexis Simpson, Shameeka Stallworth, Kenya Watson, Sherry Preyer Millender, Trarranda Richardson, Kimberly Owens, Natashi Lett, Larayn Lett, Ashley Miller, Tera Stallworth, Rachel Bullard, Yolanda Dover, Temeka McCall, Crystal Scott, Victoria Young, Candice Kidd, Jessica Watson, Nadia Pugh, Mary Ann Cobb and Joyioce Knight
Defendant: Monroeville Housing Authority, City of Monroeville, Michael Rankins, The Housing Authority of the City of Monroevile, Alabama and Tammy LaBella
Case Number: 1:2019cv00159
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Terry F. Moorer: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/11/2019. Court Reporter Roy Isbell. (mab)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORAL ORDER made in open court by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 07/11/2019: Parties' 27 Joint Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #18 & #23 ) GRANTED. Plaintiffs' responses to motions are now due by 7/29/2019. Defendants' replies are now due by 8/5/2019. (mab)
July 11, 2019 Filing 27 JOINT ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: motions to dismiss (Docs. #18 & #23 ) made in open court at telephone status conference before Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant Tammy LaBellas Motion to Dismiss, in Part, Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Doc. #23 , filed 7/5/19), which joins the Motion to Dismiss, in Part, Plaintiffs Amended Complaint filed on 6/27/19 by the Housing Authority of the City of Monroeville (Doc. #18 ), the Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall file their responses on or before Wednesday, July 24, 2019, as set out in the Courts previous Order (Doc. #21 ). Likewise, Defendant Tammy LaBella may file any reply she wishes on or before Wednesday, July 31, 2019. Courtesy copies shall be provided as noted in the prior order. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 07/09/2019. (mab)
July 8, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #23 MOTION to Dismiss , in Part, Amended Complaint Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
July 5, 2019 Filing 25 The Housing Authority for the City of Monroeville, Alabama's Amended ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by The Housing Authority of the City of Monroevile, Alabama. (Frederick, Brandi)
July 5, 2019 Filing 24 Tammy Labella's ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Tammy LaBella. (Frederick, Brandi)
July 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss , in Part, Amended Complaint by Tammy LaBella. (Frederick, Brandi)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: All parties that have appeared in this case by Wednesday, July 10, 2019, are ORDERED to appear by telephone for a status conference at 11:00 a.m. on Thursday, July 11, 2019. Instructions for dialing into the status conference will be sent to counsel via email. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 07/02/2019. (mab)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order re: #18 Motion to Dismiss, in Part, The Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs' response due 7/24/2019. Monroeville Housing Authority's reply due 7/31/2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 07/02/2019. (mab)
June 28, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Dismiss , in Part, The Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 Michael Rankins's ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Michael Rankins. (Frederick, Barry)
June 27, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by The Housing Authority of the City of Monroevile, Alabama. (Frederick, Brandi)
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss , in Part, The Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by The Housing Authority of the City of Monroevile, Alabama. (Frederick, Brandi)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ORDER. The plaintiffs have filed an #14 Amended Complaint, rendering the #7 , #11 motions to dismiss previously filed by Monroeville Housing Authority and the City of Monroeville moot. Accordingly, the motions to dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 06/14/2019. (mab)
June 14, 2019 Answer due from Michael Rankins and The Housing Authority of the City of Monroevile, Alabama pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(3). (mab)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Tammy LaBella. (Note to Counsel: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Summons as to newly added Defendant Tammy LaBella by Rachel Bullard. (Quinn, Charles) Modified on 6/14/2019 (mab).
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Quinn, Charles)
June 11, 2019 REFERRAL OF #13 Notice of Appearance & Response to Order to Judge Moorer. (tot)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance & RESPONSE to Order by Barry V. Frederick on behalf of Michael Rankins (Frederick, Barry) Modified on 6/11/2019 (tot).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: service on Defendant Michael Rankins, on or before June 14, 2019, the Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file their notice of service attempt or show cause why they have not complied with the Court's Local Rule. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 06/07/2019. (mab)
June 4, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Monroeville; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Monroeville. (Hare, Nicholas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Monroeville. (Hare, Nicholas)
May 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Defendant Monroeville Housing Authority reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Monroeville Housing Authority. (Lewis, Richard)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim by Monroeville Housing Authority. (Frederick, Brandi)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Monroeville Housing Authority. (Frederick, Brandi)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W. Lewis on behalf of Monroeville Housing Authority (Lewis, Richard)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandi Branton Frederick on behalf of Monroeville Housing Authority (Frederick, Brandi)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Monroeville Housing Authority, City of Monroeville, Michael Rankins. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons to Monroeville Housing Authority, #2 Summons to Michael Rankins) (McKenzie, Sherrie)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2376717, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Quinn, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullard et al v. The Housing Authority of the City of Monroeville, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica McKinley
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharanda Stallworth
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Dale
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casandra Mills
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolander Bullard
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gracie McMillian
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keiyauna Kyles
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmin Foster
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawanda Lett
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Allexis Simpson
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameeka Stallworth
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Watson
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Preyer Millender
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trarranda Richardson
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Owens
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natashi Lett
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larayn Lett
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Miller
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tera Stallworth
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Bullard
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Dover
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temeka McCall
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Scott
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Young
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Kidd
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Watson
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Pugh
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Cobb
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyioce Knight
Represented By: Sherrie V. McKenzie
Represented By: Charles Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroeville Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Monroeville
Represented By: Nicholas Stallworth Hare, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rankins
Represented By: Barry V. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Housing Authority of the City of Monroevile, Alabama
Represented By: Richard W. Lewis
Represented By: Brandi Branton Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy LaBella
Represented By: Brandi Branton Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?