Pete v. ProCollect Incorporated

Plaintiff: Heron Pete
Defendant: ProCollect Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv00175
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order setting a Rule 16(b) scheduling conference, via telephone, for 7/30/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. The Clerk will provide call-in instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 07/12/2019. (nah)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by ProCollect Incorporated. (Steele, William)
July 9, 2019 REFERRAL OF #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Steele. (mbp)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance for ProCollect by ProCollect Incorporated. (Yearout, Jason) Modified on 7/9/2019 (tgw).
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge William H. Steele and Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (mpp)
July 8, 2019 REFERRAL OF #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Bivins. (mpp)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Schoen, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. Consent Form due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (mpp)Copies to counsel
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (mpp) Copies to counsel
May 21, 2019 REFERRAL OF #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Bivins. (mpp)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant ProCollect Incorporated. (Traylor, William)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by ProCollect Incorporated. (Traylor, William)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed (with Affidavit of Service) by Heron Pete. ProCollect Incorporated served on 4/23/2019, answer due 5/14/2019 (Schoen, David)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 4/4/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 5/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/4/19. (mpp) Copy to Pltf
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ProCollect Incorporated. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (mpp)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ProCollect Incorporated ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2378869, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Heron Pete. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #3 Summons) (Schoen, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pete v. ProCollect Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProCollect Incorporated
Represented By: Jason L. Yearout
Represented By: William Paul Traylor, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heron Pete
Represented By: David Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?