In the Matter of GraeStone Logistics, LLC

Petitioner: In the Matter of GraeStone Logistics, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Claimants
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Cross Claimant: David Erik Crumpton
Cross Defendant: Parker Towing Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00177
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Graestone is hereby ORDERED to file, no later than 7/19/2019, an amended disclosure statement and a separate response to this order showing cause for its failure to comply with the initial deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 07/12/2019. (nah)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Disclosure [Disclosure Statement of Parker Towing Company, Inc.] by Parker Towing Company, Inc.. (Fink, Douglas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #18 filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #18 Disclosure Statement filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/9/2019. (ctn)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Claimant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (White, Jarrod)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Parker Towing Company, Inc. is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (applicable to "nongovernmental corporate" parties) and S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Fri. 7/12/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/8/2019. (ctn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 CROSSCLAIM against Parker Towing Company, Inc., filed by DAVID ERIK CRUMPTON. (Tobias, Desmond)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against In the Matter of Graestone Logistics, LLC by DAVID ERIK CRUMPTON. (Tobias, Desmond)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 Admiralty Claim filed by Parker Towing Company, Inc. (Fink, Douglas)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability by Parker Towing Company, Inc.. (Fink, Douglas)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order re: #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Graestone Logistics, LLC. Amended Disclosure Statement due by 7/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/2/2019. (tgw)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Norfolk Southern Railway Company is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (applicable to "nongovernmental corporate" parties) and S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Mon. 7/8/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/1/2019. (ctn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Annette Lanning Kinderman on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Kinderman, Annette)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Parker Towing Company, Inc. by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (White, Jarrod)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Approving Stipulation of Value and Costs, directing issuance of notice, and restraining suits. Filing of claims due 7/5/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants signed by Judge Beaverstock, #2 Ad Interim Stipulation of Value) (tgw)
May 3, 2019 REFERRAL OF #6 Ad Interim Stipulation to Judge Beaverstock. (tgw)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 AD INTERIM STIPULATION filed by In the Matter of Graestone Logistics, LLC (Dantone, Frank)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order re: #2 MOTION for Ad Interim Stipulation of Value and for Entry of Order Enjoining Suits. The Court hereby approves Petitioner's proposed Ad Interim for Value as to form only, and grants Petitioner leave to file a complete executed version of same by 5/2/19. The Court holds in abeyance all further action on the motion pending Petitiioner's filing of its stipulation. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 4/18/19. (mbp)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Petitioners In the Matter of Graestone Logistics, LLC, Graestone Logistics, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Graestone Logistics, LLC for In the Matter of Graestone Logistics, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
April 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Ad Interim Stipulation of Value and for Entry of Order Enjoining Suits to Judge Beaverstock (tgw)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Petitioners In the Matter of Graestone Logistics, LLC, Graestone Logistics, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Graestone Logistics, LLC for In the Matter of Graestone Logistics, LLC.. (Dantone, Frank)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Ad Interim Stipulation of Value and for Entry of Order Enjoining Suits by In the Matter of Graestone Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ad Interim Stipulation for Value Form) (Dantone, Frank)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability ( Filing fee $400 Receipt Number AALSDC-2379737, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by In the Matter of GraeStone Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Fred Budwine) (Dantone, Frank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of GraeStone Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In the Matter of GraeStone Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Frank J. Dantone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Jarrod J. White
Represented By: Annette Lanning Kinderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: David Erik Crumpton
Represented By: Desmond V. Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Parker Towing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas W. Fink
Represented By: Norman Matt Stockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?