Fidler v. The City of Fairhope, Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer A. Fidler
Defendant: Karin Wilson and The City of Fairhope, Alabama
Case Number: 1:2019cv00179
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
2 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 REFERRAL OF #19 Notices of Endorsement (Docs. #17 & #19 ) re: #16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Nelson. (mab)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Endorsement by Karin Wilson(individually) re: #16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Hicks, Hope)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order setting Telephone Scheduling Conference for 7/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 07/12/2019. (srd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Endorsement by The City of Fairhope, Alabama re: #16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Reid, Kirkland)
July 12, 2019 REFERRAL OF #16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Nelson. (note: need notice of endorsement from Attorney Hicks) (mab)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Spruell, Alyce)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by The City of Fairhope, Alabama. (Reid, Kirkland)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Karin Wilson(individually). (Hicks, Hope)
May 31, 2019 Answer due from The City of Fairhope, Alabama and Karin Wilson pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(3). (mab)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against The City of Fairhope, Alabama, Karin Wilson(individually), filed by Jennifer A. Fidler. (Spruell, Alyce)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 05/28/2019. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order GRANTING #4 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Karin Wilson. Claims against Karen Wilson in her official and individual capacity are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as set out. Plaintiff is ORDERED to amend Complaint no later than 5/31/2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 05/14/2019. (srd)
May 7, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 Response to Motion for Partial Dismissal to Judge Moorer. (tot)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Partial Dismissal filed by Jennifer A. Fidler. (Spruell, Alyce) Modified on 5/7/2019 (tot).
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Karin Wilson. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 04/19/20109. (Anthony, Porcha)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Karin Wilson, Karin Wilson. (Hicks, Hope)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order re: #4 Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Karin Wilson. Plaintiff's response due by 5/6/2019. Defendant's reply due by 5/13/2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 04/15/2019. (mab)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Karin Wilson(in her official capacity as mayor of the City of Fairhope), Karin Wilson(individually). (Hicks, Hope)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Brief filed by Karin Wilson(in her official capacity as mayor of the City of Fairhope), Karin Wilson(individually) re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint . (Hicks, Hope)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint by Karin Wilson(in her official capacity as mayor of the City of Fairhope), Karin Wilson(individually). (Hicks, Hope)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by The City of Fairhope, Alabama. (Reid, Kirkland)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (jlr)
April 8, 2019 Answer due from The City of Fairhope, Alabama and Karin Wilson (in her official capacity as mayor of the City of Fairhope) pursuant to FRCP 81(c). (mab)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The City of Fairhope, Alabama from Circuit Court of Baldwin County, Alabama, case number 05-CV-2019-900247.00. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2380288, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by The City of Fairhope, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Action File, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing) (Reid, Kirkland) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidler v. The City of Fairhope, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karin Wilson
Represented By: Matthew C. McDonald
Represented By: Kirkland E. Reid
Represented By: Hope Curtis Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Fairhope, Alabama
Represented By: Matthew C. McDonald
Represented By: Kirkland E. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer A. Fidler
Represented By: Alyce Manley Spruell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?