Cart v. Linzey et al

Plaintiff: Robert J. Cart
Defendant: Austal USA, LLC and Jeffrey D. Linzey
Case Number: 1:2019cv00188
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of Closing pursuant to joint stipulation of dismissal (srr)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by Austal USA, LLC. (McCarthy, Brian)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of time to respond to motion to dismiss filed by Robert J. Cart; response due 5/31/19; reply due 6/7/19. If it is plaintiff's plan to voluntary dismiss this action, the parties may file "a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared" FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/30/19. (srr)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Settlement and Motion for Extension of Time by Robert J. Cart. (Comer, Bryan)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief filed by Austal USA, LLC; Response to Motion due by 5/1/2019, Replies due by 5/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/17/19. (srr)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief by Austal USA, LLC. (McClurkin, Anne)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. McCarthy on behalf of Austal USA, LLC (McCarthy, Brian)
April 11, 2019 REFERRAL OF #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Nelson. (skb)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. Consent Form due by 5/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (skb)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (skb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Austal USA, LLC. (McClurkin, Anne)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Austal USA, LLC from Circuit Court of Baldwin County, Alabama, case number 2019-900332. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2383246, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Austal USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (McClurkin, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cart v. Linzey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austal USA, LLC
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Represented By: Brian P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey D. Linzey
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Represented By: David Kirby Howard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Cart
Represented By: David Kirby Howard, Jr.
Represented By: Bryan Eugene Comer
Represented By: Desmond V. Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?