Lang et al v. SPM Property Management
Plaintiff: Chasity James and Tammy Lang
Defendant: SPM Property Management and Southeastern Property Management
Case Number: 1:2019cv00190
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff's Tammy Lang and Chasity James to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Chasity James and Tammy Lang. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU). (srd)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order re: SPM, LLC's #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plf's Complaint. Plfs are to file a response to Dfts' motion on or before 7/8/2019. Any reply by Dft should be filed by 7/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/20/19. (copies mailed to Plfs on 6/20/19) (tot)
June 19, 2019 REFERRAL OF #19 Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss to Judge Bivins. (tot)
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by SPM Property Management. (Thompson, Joshua)
June 18, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Dismiss referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (clr)
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-B after the case number on all future pleadings. NEF mailed to Plaintiffs (clr)
June 17, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Dismiss referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (tot)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order, this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for consideration & disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/17/19. (copies mailed to Plfs on 6/17/19) (tot)
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 Pro Se NOTICE of Appearance by Chasity James, Tammy Lang. (tot)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by SPM Property Management. (Thompson, Joshua)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order GRANTING #13 MOTION for Ishmael Jaffree to Withdraw as Attorney for the Plaintiffs. Plfs are to have their new counsel file a notice of appearance, or Plfs are to notify the Court that are proceeding pro se, NLT 6/14/2019. Clerk is DIRECTED to mail orders or notice to Plfs of any hrgs which may be scheduled at the address provided by counsel in the Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 5/24/19. (copies mailed to Plfs on 5/24/19) (tot)
May 23, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Ishmael Jaffree to Withdraw as Attorney referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (tot)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Ishmael Jaffree to Withdraw as Attorney for the Plaintiffs by Chasity James, Tammy Lang. (Jaffree, Ishmael)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING Dft's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from SPM Property Management on 5/31/2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 5/16/19. (tot)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant SPM Property Management. (Geisler, Kimberly)
May 14, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Judge Moorer. (tot)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by SPM Property Management. (Geisler, Kimberly)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. SPM Property Management served on 4/29/2019 (unsigned). (tot)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SPM Property Management. SPM Property Management served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (srd)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to SPM Property Management. (Attachment: #1 Cert. Mail Receipts) (tot)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Plfs' #5 Amended Motion to Waive Filing Fee as set out. The original #2 Application is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/22/19. (tot)
April 22, 2019 REFERRAL OF #5 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Judge Moorer. (tot)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per Court Order by Chasity James, Tammy Lang. (Jaffree, Ishmael)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order re: Plf's #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plf Lang shall file an amended motion by 5/1/2019 as set out. Plf James must also complete her own motion. Plfs' counsel must disclose the fee arrangement regarding this lawsuit as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/17/19. (tot)
April 17, 2019 REFERRAL OF #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Judge Moorer. (tot)
April 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Chasity James, Tammy Lang (Jaffree, Ishmael)
April 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tammy Lang, Chasity James. (Jaffree, Ishmael) Modified on 4/17/2019 (tot).
April 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SPM Property Management ( IFP.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jaffree, Ishmael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lang et al v. SPM Property Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPM Property Management
Represented By: Joshua Stephen Thompson
Represented By: Kimberly W. Geisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Property Management
Represented By: Joshua Stephen Thompson
Represented By: Kimberly W. Geisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chasity James
Represented By: Ishmael Jaffree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Lang
Represented By: Ishmael Jaffree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?