Blair v. AutoZone Stores, LLC

Plaintiff: Charles Blair
Defendant: AutoZone Stores, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00192
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Filing Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by AutoZone Stores, LLC. (Nixon, Faith Ann)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by AutoZone Stores, LLC. (Nixon, Faith Ann)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Charles Blair. (Lyons, T.) Modified on 6/21/2019 (tot).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: All fictitious dfts listed in the complaint are STRICKEN as set out, & this case shall proceed against the named dft only. Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. Jury Selection set for 10/27/2020 at 08:45 AM. Trial is set during the month of November 2020, the specific dates to be set during the Final Pretrial Conference. ETT: 2 Days. Discovery cutoff 4/22/2020. Amended Pleadings by Plfs due by 9/30/2019 & by Dfts due by 10/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/6/2020. Position Regarding Settlement due by 4/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/17/19. (Attachment: #1 Standing Order Governing Final Pretrial Conferences) (tot) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: Scheduling Conference held on 6/17/2019. (Digital Court Recording; Courtroom 5B). (eec)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order, Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2019 at 10:00 AM, by telephone, before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/12/19. (tot)
June 10, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Murray. (tot)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Nixon, Faith Ann)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by AutoZone Stores, LLC (APG)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by AutoZone Stores, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/25/19. (tot)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants AutoZone Stores, LLC, AutoZone Investment Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AutoZone Investment Corporation for AutoZone Stores, LLC.. (Nixon, Faith Ann)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 Copy of blank Disclosure Statement for e-mailed to Defendant AutoZone Stores, LLC; Disclosure Statement Due 4/30/2019. (Counsel, please identify members of the LLC.) (mab)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 04/24/2019. (mab)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray and is now assigned to the docket of Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AutoZone Stores, LLC. (Nixon, Faith Ann)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
April 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AutoZone Stores, LLC from Circuit Court of Mobile County, case number CV-2019-900716. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2385143, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by AutoZone Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Demand, #3 Exhibit C Conversion, #4 Exhibit D Annual Report, #5 Exhibit E Service, #6 Exhibit Notice to State) (Nixon, Faith Ann) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2019: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. AutoZone Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Stores, LLC
Represented By: Faith Ann Pate Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Blair
Represented By: T. Randall Lyons
Represented By: David J. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?