Moree v. Wells Fargo Bank et al

Plaintiff: James Kevin Moree
Defendant: Specialized Loan Services and Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv00194
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order re email circulated to opposing counsel and advising Plaintiff that use of governmental email is not permitted by law or practice as set out. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 06/24/2019. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER denying #24 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/19/2019. (Steele, William)
June 17, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Order & Judgment (Docs. 19 & 20) by James Kevin Moree - Ref to Judge Steele (tgw)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re: #21 Motion for Judgment against Specialized Loan Servicing & #22 Motion to Remand. The motions are denied, as set out. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/14/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
June 12, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand and to Dispute the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Validated Claim by James Kevin Moree - Ref to Judge Steele (tgw)
June 12, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Judgment Against Specialized Loan Servicing For Not Responding To Claim In The Time Given By The Judicial System by James Kevin Moree - Ref to Judge Steele (tgw)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order of Court dated June 7, 2019, the plaintiff shall have and recover nothing of the defendants. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC and against plaintiff James Kevin Moree. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/7/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss; granting #11 Motion to Dismiss; denying #13 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying #15 Motion for Default Judgment. The Counterclaim brought by defendant Specialized Loan Servicing is denied. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/7/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
May 21, 2019 REFERRAL OF #17 Response in Opposition to Motion & #18 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Steele. (tgw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Specialized Loan Servicing filed by Specialized Loan Services. (Gaston, George)
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Specialized Loan Services. (Gaston, George)
May 16, 2019 REFERRAL OF #16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to Judge Steele. (tgw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wells Fargo Bank. (Manley, Reid)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Specialized Loan Services by James Kevin Moree - Ref to Judge Steele (tgw)
May 14, 2019 REFERRAL OF #14 Response in Support of Motion to Judge Steele. (mbp)
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Wells Fargo Bank. (Manley, Reid)
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response to Motion to Dismiss by James Kevin Moree - Ref to Judge Steele (tgw)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Specialized Loan Services. Responses due by 5/15/2019, Replies due by 5/22/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 5/2/2019. (tgw)
May 2, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Steele (tgw)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Specialized Loan Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Gaston, George)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Motion for Disclosure #3 filed by Specialized Loan Services. (Steele, William)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Wells Fargo Bank. (Steele, William)
April 25, 2019 REFERRAL OF #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Steele. (mbp)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Wells Fargo Bank (Milling, Bert)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, Wells Fargo & Company identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank.. (Rummage, Ryan)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank. Responses due by 5/6/2019, Replies due by 5/13/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/22/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
April 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support Thereof to Judge Steele (nah)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Motion for Disclosure #3 filed by Specialized Loan Services (Milling, Bert)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support Thereof by Wells Fargo Bank. (Rummage, Ryan)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Services. (Gaston, George) Modified on 4/22/2019 (nah).
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint for Interpleader and Declaratory Relief, COUNTERCLAIM against James Kevin Moree by Specialized Loan Services. (Gaston, George)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank from Clarke County Circuit, case number 16-CV-2019-000002. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2385698, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Wells Fargo Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court, #3 Exhibit B - Consent) (Manley, Reid)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moree v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Services
Represented By: George Carroll Gaston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kevin Moree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?