Snider v. Boatwright et al

Plaintiff: LaBryson Snider
Defendant: Tom Boatwright and Lt. Fred Conner
Case Number: 1:2019cv00197
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 REFERRAL OF #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by LaBryson Snider to Judge Murray (PSU). (nah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00222. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 18, 2019 Case transferred to the Southern District of Alabama; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/18/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) The #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2) This case is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of AL; 3) The #2 application to proceed without prepayment of fees is left for resolution after transfer; DIRECTING the Clerk to take the appropriate steps to effectuate the transfer of this case; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/18/2019.]
April 18, 2019 No objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/18/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of AL pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1406(a); Objections to R&R due by 4/12/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/29/2019. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/18/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by LaBryson Snider. (beh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/18/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Tom Boatwright, Fred Conner, filed by LaBryson Snider. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(beh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snider v. Boatwright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Boatwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Fred Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaBryson Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?