Pinder v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Jonathan B. Pinder
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00216
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 6/3/2019 as to Social Security Administration (tgw)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Atty. U.S. Atty. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (srd)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Lee Wiseman on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (Wiseman, Holly)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/13/2019. (skb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. (skb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2019: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (skb).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to serve the defendant. The #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/13/2019. (tgw)
May 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tgw)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan B. Pinder. (Holland, Laura)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order directing Plaintiff to file an amended IFP motion by 5/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/8/2019. (tgw)
May 6, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tgw)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan B. Pinder. (Holland, Laura)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill ( IFP.), filed by Jonathan B. Pinder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (Holland, Laura) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/6/2019) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinder v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan B. Pinder
Represented By: Laura Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?