Ortega v. Jackson
Plaintiff: Susan Marie Ortega
Defendant: Ronnie Earl Jackson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00217
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 9:00 AM in US Courthouse, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. Motions to amend pleadings due by 11/01/2019. Discovery cutoff 3/6/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020. Jury Selection set for 8/4/2020 at 8:45 AM in US Courthouse, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. Jury Trial set for the August 2020 term in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, Alabama 36602 before Judge Callie V. S. Granade. ETT 2 days. Position Regarding Settlement due by 3/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 06/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (srd) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 19, 2019 REFERRAL OF #4 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Milling. (tot)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Dunagan, D.)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 05/07/2019. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ronnie Earl Jackson. (Dunagan, D.)
May 6, 2019 Answer due from Ronnie Earl Jackson pursuant to FRCP 81(c). (mab)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ronnie Earl Jackson from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number CV-2019-900850. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2394619, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Ronnie Earl Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Dunagan, D.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd). M

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Marie Ortega
Represented By: Davis Lawson Middlemas
Represented By: Scott Michael DeZouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Earl Jackson
Represented By: D. Gregory Dunagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?