Zirlott v. Discountramps.com, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Regina Zirlott
Defendant: Metals USA Plates and Shapes, Inc., Southern Gas and Supply, Inc., Cypress Employment, HD Ramps, LLC, Discountramps.com, LLC and Cypress Employment Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00218
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 30 Remand Letter, Certified Docket Sheet and Order sent via Email to Circuit Court of Mobile County re #29 Order on Motion to Remand. (srd)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Remand. The Clerk is directed to take such steps to transfer this action as set out. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 07/03/2019. (srd)
June 26, 2019 REFERRAL OF #28 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Steele. (tgw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion #16 to Remand filed by Regina Zirlott. (Tobias, Desmond)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order setting a Telephone Scheduling Conference for 7/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 06/24/2019. (srd) Copy to Judge Murray (CRD).
June 21, 2019 REFERRAL OF #26 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Judge Murray. (srd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (White, Jarrod)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order re: #16 MOTION to Remand. Plaintiffs are directed to file a reply by 6/25/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/18/2019. (tgw)
June 13, 2019 REFERRAL OF #24 Joinder in Motion to Judge Steele. (tgw)
June 12, 2019 Filing 24 Joinder in MOTION re #16 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum of Law . (Rich, David)
June 12, 2019 REFERRAL OF #21 Response to Motion, #23 Joinder in Motion to Judge Steele. (tgw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 23 Joinder in MOTION re #16 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum of Law . (Nixon, Faith Ann)
June 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David Abraham Rich on behalf of Cypress Employment Services, LLC (Rich, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re: #16 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Discountramps.com, LLC, HD Ramps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (White, Jarrod)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order re: #16 MOTION to Remand. Responses due by 6/11/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/6/2019. (tgw)
June 4, 2019 REFERRAL OF #19 Reply to Judge Steele. (tgw)
June 4, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to #18 Supplement to Motion to Remand filed by Discountramps.com, LLC, HD Ramps, LLC. (White, Jarrod) Modified on 6/4/2019 (tgw).
May 31, 2019 REFERRAL OF #18 Supplement to Motion to Remand to Judge Steele. (tgw)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 Supplement to Motion to Remand by Regina Zirlott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Exhibit Ex C, #4 Exhibit Ex D) (McCormick, Jason) Modified on 5/31/2019 (tgw).
May 24, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum of Law & #17 MOTION to Stay to Judge Steele (tgw)
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay re #10 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT VI OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Regina Zirlott. (McCormick, Jason)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Regina Zirlott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (McCormick, Jason)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cypress Employment Services, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/23/2019. (tgw)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: The #13 Preliminary Scheduling Order was entered in error and the parties are directed to disregard this Order. The previously entered Preliminary Scheduling Order (Doc. #4 ) entered on 5/7/2019 remains in effect. (tgw)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (skb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #11 filed by Cypress Employment Services, LLC. (Steele, William)
May 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT VI OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT to Judge Steele (tgw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Cypress Employment Services, LLC. (Gregory, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT VI OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Cypress Employment Services, LLC. (Gregory, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S. McCormick on behalf of Regina Zirlott (McCormick, Jason)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Eugene Comer on behalf of Regina Zirlott (Comer, Bryan)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order directing Plaintiffs to file a brief to the jurisdictional allegations by 5/28/2019. Defendants' reply is due by 6/4/2019 Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 05/14/2019. (srd) Modified on 5/23/2019 (tgw).
May 14, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Dismiss referred to Judge Steele. (mbp)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Metals USA Plates and Shapes, Inc.. (Nixon, Faith Ann)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Discountramps.com, LLC, HD Ramps, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 05/07/2019. (srd)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Discountramps.com, LLC, HD Ramps, LLC. (White, Jarrod)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Discountramps.com, LLC, HD Ramps, LLC. (White, Jarrod)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Discountramps.com, LLC, HD Ramps, LLC from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number CV-19-900917. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2394820, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Discountramps.com, LLC, HD Ramps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Errata C) (White, Jarrod) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zirlott v. Discountramps.com, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metals USA Plates and Shapes, Inc.
Represented By: Faith Ann Pate Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Gas and Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cypress Employment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Ramps, LLC
Represented By: Jarrod J. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discountramps.com, LLC
Represented By: Jarrod J. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cypress Employment Services, LLC
Represented By: David Abraham Rich
Represented By: Michael Hagel Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Zirlott
Represented By: Desmond V. Tobias
Represented By: Jason S. McCormick
Represented By: Bryan Eugene Comer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?