Waters v. USAA Federal Savings Bank

Plaintiff: Gail Waters
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv00225
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
2 Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. To ensure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. NEF mailed to Youssef Hussein Hammoud, Esq. (clr)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Youssef Hussein Hammoud to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 7/2/2019. NEF and Notice of Mandatory Electronic Filing mailed to counsel. (clr)
July 2, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Youssef Hammoud to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2424501, Online Credit Card Payment.) - Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (tgw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Youssef Hammoud to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2424501, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Gail Waters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Adkins, Micah)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/22/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (skb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant A. Premo on behalf of USAA Federal Savings Bank (Premo, Grant)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Anderson, Keith)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gail Waters Proof of Service (USAA) ; USAA Federal Savings Bank served 5/15/2019 (Adkins, Micah) Modified on 5/21/2019 (tgw).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 5/9/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 6/24/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 5/9/2019. (tgw)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to USAA Federal Savings Bank. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service (tgw)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2396381, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Gail Waters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to USAA) (Adkins, Micah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waters v. USAA Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Waters
Represented By: Micah Stephen Adkins
Represented By: Youssef Hussein Hammoud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Represented By: Grant A. Premo
Represented By: Keith Steven Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?