Hancock Whitney Bank v. Dorsey & Dorsey Engineering, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Defendant: Larry Charles Dorsey, Dorsey & Dorsey Engineering, Inc. and Pamela D. Dorsey
Case Number: 1:2019cv00226
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Dorsey & Dorsey Engineering, Inc.. (Moon, Alvin)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER re: #13 Order,, Set Deadlines, by Larry Charles Dorsey, Pamela D. Dorsey, Dorsey & Dorsey Engineering, Inc. filed by Larry Charles Dorsey, Pamela D. Dorsey, Dorsey & Dorsey Engineering, Inc.. (Moon, Alvin)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order directing Dorsey & Dorsey Engineering to file a disclosure statement by 7/10/2019 and, also by this date, file a separate response to this order showing cause for failure to comply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/3/2019. (tgw)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 06/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (srd)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Dorsey & Dorsey Engineering, Inc. is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (applicable to "nongovernmental corporate" parties) and S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Mon. 7/1/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/25/2019. (ctn)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Larry Charles Dorsey, Pamela D. Dorsey, Dorsey & Dorsey Engineering, Inc.. (Moon, Alvin)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #6 Disclosure Statement filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/16/2019. (ctn)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to all Defendants by Hancock Whitney Bank. All Defendants (Mahoney, Philip)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Hancock Whitney Bank, Avoca Incorporated, Hancock Bank Securities Corporation II, Hancock Whitney Corporation, Berwick, LLC, Hancock Insurance Agency, HMC, LLC, Whitney Coon Bayou Investor, LLC, Hancock Whitney Equipment Finance, LLC, Hancock Whitney Finance and Leasing, LLC, Whitney New Markets Investor, LLC, Hancock New Markets Investor, LLC (Various), Hancock Whitney New Markets Investor, LLC, Hancock Whitney New Markets Fund, LLC, Hancock Whitney New Markets CDE, LLC, AL-FS, LLC, FS Properties of LA, LLC, HBLA Properties, LLC, HBRE Management, LLC, LA-FS Properties, LLC, MS-FS, LLC, MS-SA, LLC, Properties of TX-FS, LLC, SA-FL, LLC, SA-FL Legacy, LLC, TSPFL Holding, LLC, Terre Aux Boeufs Land Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hancock Whitney Corporation, Other Affiliate Avoca Incorporated, Other Affiliate Hancock Bank Securities Corporation II, Other Affiliate Berwick, LLC, Other Affiliate Hancock Insurance Agency, Other Affiliate HMC, LLC, Other Affiliate Whitney Coon Bayou Investor, LLC, Other Affiliate Hancock Whitney Equipment Finance, LLC, Other Affiliate Hancock Whitney Finance and Leasing, LLC, Other Affiliate Whitney New Markets Investor, LLC, Other Affiliate Hancock New Markets Investor, LLC (Various), Other Affiliate Hancock Whitney New Markets Investor, LLC, Other Affiliate Hancock Whitney New Markets Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Hancock Whitney New Markets CDE, LLC, Other Affiliate AL-FS, LLC, Other Affiliate FS Properties of LA, LLC, Other Affiliate HBLA Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate HBRE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate LA-FS Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate MS-FS, LLC, Other Affiliate MS-SA, LLC, Other Affiliate Properties of TX-FS, LLC, Other Affiliate SA-FL, LLC, Other Affiliate SA-FL Legacy, LLC, Other Affiliate TSPFL Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate Terre Aux Boeufs Land Co., Inc. for Hancock Whitney Bank.. (Mahoney, Philip)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Service Order entered 5/13/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 6/24/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 5/13/2019. (tgw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Larry Charles Dorsey, Pamela D. Dorsey, Dorsey & Dorsey Engineering, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Mahoney, Philip)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order #1 Complaint filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file and serve an amended complaint that corrects deficiencies and file a disclosure statement on or before 5/17/2019 as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 05/10/2019. (srd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dorsey & Dorsey Engineering, Inc., Pamela D. Dorsey and Larry Charles Dorsey ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2396883, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Mahoney, Philip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock Whitney Bank v. Dorsey & Dorsey Engineering, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Charles Dorsey
Represented By: Alvin L. Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorsey & Dorsey Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Alvin L. Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela D. Dorsey
Represented By: Alvin L. Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Represented By: Philip Daniel Mahoney
Represented By: Jeffery J. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?