Hartnett et al v. Estate of John William Chislett, Deceased
Plaintiff: Cathleen Chislett Hartnett and John W. Chislett, Jr.
Defendant: Estate of John William Chislett, Deceased
Intervenor: Ms. Sally M. Chislett
Case Number: 1:2019cv00232
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 REFERRAL OF #13 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (tgw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Sally M. Chislett. (Myrick, Joshua)
June 28, 2019 REFERRAL OF #12 Response to Order to Judge Beaverstock. (tgw)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER re: #2 Service Order by John W. Chislett, Jr, Cathleen Chislett Hartnett filed by John W. Chislett, Jr, Cathleen Chislett Hartnett. (Tyler, Deena)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cathleen Chislett Hartnett, John W. Chislett, Jr. John W. Chislett, Jr waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Tyler, Deena)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cathleen Chislett Hartnett, John W. Chislett, Jr. Cathleen Chislett Hartnett waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Tyler, Deena)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jane Yang Chislett on 06/25/2019 by John W. Chislett, Jr, Cathleen Chislett Hartnett. Waiver of Service due by 8/26/2019. (Tyler, Deena)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Carol Ann Wagner on 06/25/2019 by John W. Chislett, Jr, Cathleen Chislett Hartnett. Waiver of Service due by 7/25/2019. (Tyler, Deena)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Robert Stankoski, Jr on behalf of Sally M. Chislett (Stankoski, Daniel)
June 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction referred to Judge Beaverstock. (mbp)
June 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem for Defendant; and #4 MOTION to Intervene Referred to Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. (mab)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Case re-assigned to District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab)
June 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Intervene by Sally M. Chislett; Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Sally M. Chislett. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sally Chislett, #2 Exhibit Marriage Certificate, #3 Exhibit Last Will and Testament) (Myrick, Joshua)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Intervene by Sally M. Chislett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PACER Party Summary) (Myrick, Joshua)
May 14, 2019 REFERRAL OF #3 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem to Judge Granade. (tot)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by All Plaintiffs. (Tyler, Deena)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Service Notice entered 5/14/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 6/27/2019. (tot)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Estate of John William Chislett, deceased (Filing Fee $400; Receipt No. BALSDC-2398560, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Cathleen Chislett Hartnett, John W. Chislett, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tyler, Deena) Modified on 5/14/2019 (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartnett et al v. Estate of John William Chislett, Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Chislett Hartnett
Represented By: Deena Renee Tyler
Represented By: Joseph Michael Druhan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Chislett, Jr.
Represented By: Deena Renee Tyler
Represented By: Joseph Michael Druhan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of John William Chislett, Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ms. Sally M. Chislett
Represented By: Daniel Robert Stankoski, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua Paul Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?