West v. Rent-A-Center East, Inc.
Plaintiff: Linda West
Defendant: Rent-A-Center East, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00238
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order re: #16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Rent-A-Center East, Inc., ( Scheduling Conference, by telephone, set for 7/25/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray.) To access the telephone conference, the parties' attorneys are to use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/8/2019. (eec)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Rent-A-Center East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pryor, Caroline)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Rent-A-Center East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A) (Pryor, Caroline)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Pryor, Caroline)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 motion to withdraw motion to remand; #10 Motion to Remand to State Court is WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/27/19. (srr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Render Moot re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Linda West. (Kittrell, William)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be referred to the United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P.73. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 06/20/2019. (nah)
June 19, 2019 REFERRAL OF #12 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge to Judge Kristi K. DuBose. (eec)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Rent-A-Center East, Inc... (Ryan, Sarah)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order re: #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Linda West, ( Consent/Request Form due by 7/1/2019., Response to Motion due by 7/1/2019, Replies due by 7/18/2019., Motion to be taken under submission on 7/9/2019.). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge) (eec)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Linda West. (Kittrell, William)
May 22, 2019 Remark: Docket Entry No. 3 removed; see Order at Doc. 9 (eec)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/21/2019. (eec)
May 20, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document . Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (eec)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/20/2019. (eec)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Rent-A-Center East, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/20/2019. (eec)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rent-A-Center East, Inc.. (Ryan, Sarah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Rent-A-Center East, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rent-A-Center, Inc. for Rent-A-Center East, Inc... (Ryan, Sarah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document by Rent-A-Center East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ryan, Sarah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rent-A-Center East, Inc. from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number 02-CV-2019-901069. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2401164, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Rent-A-Center East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit Exhibit "E", #6 Exhibit Exhibit "F", #7 Exhibit Exhibit "G") (Ryan, Sarah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2019: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec). (Attachment 6 replaced on 5/22/2019) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Rent-A-Center East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda West
Represented By: William Bradford Kittrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent-A-Center East, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Thomason Pryor
Represented By: Sarah Cross Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?