DeLapp v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: James A. DeLapp
Defendant: 3M Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00239
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 ***Case Transfer Confirmation. Case received and opened in Northern District of Florida, Case Number 3:19-cv-01652. (skb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Florida requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District electronically. Case Closed. (nah)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James A. DeLapp. 3M Company served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019 (Amey, Grant)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James A. DeLapp ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2402211, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by James A. DeLapp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Amey, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeLapp v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. DeLapp
Represented By: Frederick T. Kuykendall, III
Represented By: Grant D. Amey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?