Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland v. Rod Cooke Construction, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Defendant: Expert Estimating & Construction Management Services, LLC, Fed 1, LLC, Katherine H Cooke, Rod Cooke Construction, Inc., Rod Cooke Construction of Mississippi, Inc., Rodney W. Cooke and Fed I, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00241
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane M. Daily on behalf of Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Daily, Jane)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 06/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (srd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Katherine H Cooke. (Holifield, Jennifer)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, by Fed I, LLC. (Holifield, Jennifer)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Rodney W. Cooke, Expert Estimating & Construction Management Services, LLC, Rod Cooke Construction of Mississippi, Inc., Rod Cooke Construction, Inc.. (Holifield, Jennifer)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Katherine H Cooke, Rodney W. Cooke, Expert Estimating & Construction Management Services, LLC, Rod Cooke Construction of Mississippi, Inc., Rod Cooke Construction, Inc., Fed I, LLC, filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Taylor, Alec)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. Katherine H Cooke served on 6/1/2019, answer due 6/24/2019 (Taylor, Alec)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. Rodney W. Cooke served on 6/1/2019, answer due 6/24/2019 (Taylor, Alec)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. Expert Estimating & Construction Management Services, LLC served on 6/1/2019, answer due 6/24/2019 (Taylor, Alec)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. Rod Cooke Construction, Inc. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019 (Taylor, Alec)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The #5 Motion to Dismiss Incorrect Entity and Substitute Correct Entity, construed as a motion to amend complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended complaint within 15 days of this Order. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 6/7/2019. (tgw)
June 7, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 Ex Parte MOTION Dismiss Incorrect Entity and Substitute Correct Entity to Judge Beaverstock (tgw)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION Dismiss Incorrect Entity and Substitute Correct Entity re #1 Complaint, by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email with attachments from Steve Cox) (Taylor, Alec)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Katherine H Cooke, Rodney W. Cooke, Expert Estimating & Construction Management Services, LLC, Fed 1, LLC, Rod Cooke Construction of Mississippi, Inc., Rod Cooke Construction, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Taylor, Alec)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Service Order entered 5/21/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 7/4/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 5/21/2019. (tgw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2402042, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A General Indemnity Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Bonds Murphy High School, #3 Exhibit C Bonds Burns Middle School, #4 Exhibit D Letters of Voluntary Default, #5 Exhibit E Indemnity Demands) (Taylor, Alec) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland v. Rod Cooke Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expert Estimating & Construction Management Services, LLC
Represented By: I. David Cherniak
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fed 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine H Cooke
Represented By: I. David Cherniak
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Cooke Construction, Inc.
Represented By: I. David Cherniak
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Cooke Construction of Mississippi, Inc.
Represented By: I. David Cherniak
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney W. Cooke
Represented By: I. David Cherniak
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fed I, LLC
Represented By: I. David Cherniak
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Alec Michael Taylor
Represented By: Jane M. Daily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?