Southern Recycling, L.L.C. v. Mega MS Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Southern Recycling, L.L.C.
Defendant: Mega MS Ltd. and Estate and/or Personal Representative of Ignacio Herrera
Case Number: 1:2019cv00242
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselor Tarak Anada, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana, who has complied with the rules of this Court, be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above entitled cause.Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/20/19. (Cassady, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Tarak Anada to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2418406, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Southern Recycling, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Rebarchak, James)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mega MS Ltd. by Southern Recycling, L.L.C.. Mega MS Ltd. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019 (Rebarchak, James)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mega MS Ltd.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srr)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Estate and/or Personal Representative of Ignacio Herrera, Mega MS Ltd. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2402171, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Southern Recycling, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rebarchak, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Recycling, L.L.C. v. Mega MS Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Recycling, L.L.C.
Represented By: James Rebarchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mega MS Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate and/or Personal Representative of Ignacio Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?