Revel v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Leighann Marie Revel and Leighann M. Revel
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00248
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leighann M. Revel. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Returned Summons Chief Counsel, #2 Returned Summons Atty Gen) (Holland, Laura)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Lee Wiseman on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Wiseman, Holly)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/28/19. (tot)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill (Attny Gen of the United States, U.S. Attny, & SSA). (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (Fee Paid: $400.00; Receipt No. 46031050499), filed by Leighann Marie Revel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (Thomas, Ashley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2019: #5 Receipt for Fee) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Revel v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leighann Marie Revel
Represented By: Laura Holland
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leighann M. Revel
Represented By: Laura Holland
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?