Buza v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Stanislav Buza
Defendant: Denise Frazier, Nicolas Bartell, Kevin McAleenan and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2019cv00267
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/12/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (skb)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/20/2019, Replies due by 9/3/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/30/2019. (tgw)
July 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Beaverstock (tgw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nicolas Bartell, L. Francis Cissna, Denise Frazier, Kevin McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Agency Notice of Intent to Deny) (Wiseman, Holly)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (tgw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 6/14/2019 as to U.S. Attorney General (tgw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanislav Buza. Nicolas Bartell served on 6/13/2019. (Gorinshteyn, Olesia) Modified on 7/3/2019 (tgw).
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanislav Buza. Denise Frazier served on 6/13/2019. (Gorinshteyn, Olesia) Modified on 7/3/2019 (tgw).
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanislav Buza. L. Francis Cissna served on 6/19/2019. (Gorinshteyn, Olesia) Modified on 7/3/2019 (tgw).
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanislav Buza. Kevin McAleenan served on 6/13/2019. (Gorinshteyn, Olesia) Modified on 7/3/2019 (tgw).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Olesia Gorinshteyn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/18/2019. (ktw)
June 17, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Olesia Gorinshteyn, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2415877, Online Credit Card Payment.) - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (tgw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Olesia Gorinshteyn, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2415877, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Stanislav Buza. (Gorinshteyn, Olesia) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/17/2019) (tgw).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 6/7/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 7/22/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 6/7/2019. (tgw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nicolas Bartell, L. Francis Cissna, Denise Frazier, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorney's Office. NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Stanislav Buza (Gorinshteyn, Olesia)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2410744, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Stanislav Buza. (Gorinshteyn, Olesia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buza v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Frazier
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Bartell
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanislav Buza
Represented By: Olesia Gorinshteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?