Gulfstream Natural Gas System, LLC v. Redd et al
Plaintiff: Gulfstream Natural Gas System, LLC
Defendant: Todd Le Redd and BethAnn Redd
Case Number: 1:2019cv00270
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for motion in opposition to remand served on Elizabeth Howell on 07/30/2019, filed by BethAnn Redd. (Redd, BethAnn)
July 30, 2019 REFERRAL OF #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Judge Murray. (nah)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by BethAnn Redd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ATTACHMENT1, #2 Exhibit ATTACHMENT2, #3 Exhibit ATTACHMENT3, #4 Exhibit ATTACHMENT4, #5 Exhibit ATTACHMENT5, #6 Exhibit ATTACHMENT6, #7 Exhibit ATTACHMENT7, #8 Exhibit NOTICE, #9 Exhibit APPRAISAL 1, #10 Exhibit APPRAISAL 2) (Redd, BethAnn)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order GRANTING #8 MOTION to defer the obligation of the parties to meet, confer and file a Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 07/08/2019. (Copy mailed to Defendant) (nah)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Gulfstream Natural Gas System, LLC. Defendants responses due by 7/31/2019. Plaintiff reply due by 8/7/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 07/08/2019. (Copy mailed to Defendant) (nah)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gulfstream Natural Gas System, LLC re #7 Brief, (Howell, Sara)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gulfstream Natural Gas System, LLC re #6 MOTION to Remand (Howell, Sara)
July 8, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION an order deferring the obligation of the parties to meet, confer and file a Rule 26(f) report - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION an order deferring the obligation of the parties to meet, confer and file a Rule 26(f) report re #5 Preliminary Scheduling Order by Gulfstream Natural Gas System, LLC. (Howell, Sara)
July 3, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Remand and REFERRAL OF #7 Brief, to Judge Murray. (nah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Brief filed by Gulfstream Natural Gas System, LLC re #6 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Plaintiff's Application for Order Permitting Entry, #2 Exhibit "B" Certified Mail Receipts, #3 Exhibit "C" Defendant's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Exhibit "D" Land Appraisal Parcel 010, #5 Exhibit "E" Land Appraisal Parcel 011) (Howell, Sara)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Gulfstream Natural Gas System, LLC. (Howell, Sara)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 06/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Copy mailed to Defendant) (nah)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 06/17/2019. (Copy mailed to Defendants) (nah)
June 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (clr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. NEF mailed to Defendants. (clr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BethAnn Redd, Todd Le Redd - Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (nah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Todd Le Redd, BethAnn Redd from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number 02-CV-2019-901343.00, filed by BethAnn Redd, Todd Le Redd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulfstream Natural Gas System, LLC v. Redd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulfstream Natural Gas System, LLC
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Le Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BethAnn Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?