Carbajal v. The Retreat at Bon Secour Owners Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Raymundo Carbajal, Jr.
Defendant: Andy Bauer and The Retreat at Bon Secour Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00287
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STAYING CASE, the preliminary scheduling order is VACATED and this action is STAYED for all purposes until otherwise ordered. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this action for administrative and statistical purposes. Plaintiff and defendant Andy Bauer are ORDERED to file a joint Status Report by 1/29/2020 and no earlier than 7 calendar days prior to that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/30/19. (srr)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order that the state law claims in this action are REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Baldwin County, AL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/29/19. certified copy of Circuit Ct Baldwin Co, AL (srr)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order that any interested party may file a Brief by 7/25/2019 showing cause why the Court should not decline to continue exercising supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims in this case and remand them to state court, after which the matter will be taken under submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/11/19. (srr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Eugene Davis, Jr on behalf of The Retreat at Bon Secour Owners Association, Inc. (Davis, Richard)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Raymundo Carbajal, Jr. (Thetford, Joseph)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #6 Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by Andy Bauer. (Wettermark, Lawrence)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order that defendant Bauer shall file and serve a Brief by 6/27/2019 showing cause why this case should not be remanded sua sponte under 1447(c) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction for reasons stated in order; plaintiff may file a Responses due by 7/8/2019 after which the matter will be taken under submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/13/19. (srr)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/13/19. (Attachments: #1 consent) (srr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment) (srr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Andy Bauer. (Hunter, Melissa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Andy Bauer re: #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Pleadings) (Hunter, Melissa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andy Bauer from Baldwin County Circuit Court, case number CV-2017-900876. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2414311, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Andy Bauer. (Hunter, Melissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (srr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carbajal v. The Retreat at Bon Secour Owners Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymundo Carbajal, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph D. Thetford, Jr.
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Bauer
Represented By: Lawrence M. Wettermark
Represented By: Andrew John Rutens
Represented By: Melissa P. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Retreat at Bon Secour Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Eugene Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?