Quinn v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Derek Quinn
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00289
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 the Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The Rule 26 Meeting Report is due not later than 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 7/30/2019. (Milling, Bert)
July 30, 2019 REFERRAL OF #16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference to Judge Milling. (note: need notice of endorsement from Mr. Quinn) (mab)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Ronderos, Joseph)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER, Plaintiff's #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response is GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted access to electronic filing and docketing. The deadline for Plaintiff to file his response to #8 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is EXTENDED to 8/22/2019. The Deadline for Defendant to file a reply is EXTENDED to 8/29/2019. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Noel J. Nelson. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 07/22/2019. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss/ #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, by Derek Quinn; Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order, construing #11 motion to substitute counsel to be Attorney Noel J. Nelson's #11 motion to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Upon receipt of a notice certifying that a copy of the motion has been served on Mr. Quinn, the motion to withdraw will be granted without further order of the Court. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 07/19/2019. (mab)
July 18, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Derek Quinn. (Nelson, Noel) Modified on 7/19/2019 (mab).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order re: #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a response by 7/23/2019 and Defendant to file reply by 7/30/2019 as set out. Motion to be taken under submission after 7/30/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 07/11/2019. (srd)
July 10, 2019 REFERRAL OF #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and #9 Brief in Support to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Brief filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. (Ronderos, Joseph)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Responses due by 7/23/2019 (Ronderos, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Milling, Bert)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (APG)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Ronderos, Joseph)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 06/14/2019. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Blank Disclosure Statement e-mailed to Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company; Disclosure Statement Due 6/19/2019. (mab)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits FILED State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company re: #1 Notice of Removal, (Ronderos, Joseph)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number 2-cv-2018-901834.00. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2414251, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ronderos, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinn v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Quinn
Represented By: Noel J. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Shaun Kevin Ramey
Represented By: Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?