Redmond v. Sacred Heart Health System Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Redmond
Defendant: Ardent Americas, LLC and Sacred Heart Health System Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00317
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Attorney Robert Joseph Camp terminated. Granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time and the deadline for Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading is stayed until further notice. (Response to Order for Pltf due by 9/6/2019 to retain counsel as set out). With respect to Plaintiffs Stipulation of Dismissal - Doc. #11 ,the Court finds that it has no effect since it does not appear thatit was filed with Plaintiffs authorization. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/23/19. (mpp)Copies to counsel & Pltf with a copy of the Pro Se Handbook to be mailed 8/26/19.
August 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Telephone Conference held on 8/23/2019. Order to follow. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (mpp)
August 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mpp)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Sacred Heart Health System Inc.. (Ward, Kimberly)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Smith on behalf of Ardent Americas, LLC (Smith, David)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Status Conference set, via telephone, for 8/23/2019 10:00 a.m. (CST) before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/21/2019. (ktw)
August 21, 2019 REFERRAL OF #11 Stipulation of Dismissal to Judge Bivins. (mpp)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal Ardent Americas, LLC by Anthony Redmond. (Camp, Robert)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Anthony Redmond re #7 Order, Set Deadlines Notice of Service and Last Known Address (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Camp, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Redmond. Sacred Heart Health System Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019 (Camp, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Summons Return Executed by Anthony Redmond. Ardent Americas, LLC served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019 (Camp, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order re: #6 MOTION for Robert J. Camp to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Anthony Redmond (Camp is directed to file NLT 8/20/2019 docs. as set out) Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/13/19. (mpp) Copy to Pltf. atty.
August 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Robert J. Camp Motion to Withdraw As Counsel For Plaintiff. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mpp)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Robert J. Camp to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw As Counsel For Plaintiff filed by All Plaintiffs. (Camp, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ardent Americas, LLC, Sacred Heart Health System Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ardent) (mpp)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons-Ardent Americas, #2 Summons-Sacred Heart Health System, Inc.) (Camp, Robert)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 6/27/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/27/19. (mpp) Copy to Pltf.
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment) (mpp)Copy to Pltf
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2421718, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Camp, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mpp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redmond v. Sacred Heart Health System Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Redmond
Represented By: Robert Joseph Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardent Americas, LLC
Represented By: David M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacred Heart Health System Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Renee Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?