Ricks v. Saul
Plaintiff: Shamon L. Ricks
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00319
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Answer due deadline changed per correct date entered on Doc. 10 (nah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shamon L. Ricks. U.S. Attorney's Office served 07/03/2019, answer due 10/01/2019 (Thomas, Ashley) Modified on 7/22/2019 (nah).
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shamon L. Ricks. Social Security Administration served 07/05/2019. (Thomas, Ashley) Modified on 7/22/2019 (nah).
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Attorney General served on 07/09/2019. (Thomas, Ashley) Modified on 7/22/2019 (nah).
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Lee Wiseman on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Wiseman, Holly)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 06/28/2019. (nah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul (SSA), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 46031050787 (nah)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the required filing fee by 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 06/27/2019. (nah)
June 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shamon L. Ricks. (Thomas, Ashley)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Shannon L. Ricks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (Thomas, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricks v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamon L. Ricks
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?