Bush v. William Jackson, et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Bush
Defendant: Timothy Shane Gilliam, Mark S. Dunston, Krista Kuykendall, City of Ocean Springs, Barbara LNU, Carl Johnson, Kelly Anderson, William Jackson and Gary Anderson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00322
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
2 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
3 Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order entered designating Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray to serve in the Southern District of Alabama in the matter of Bush v. Jackson, No. 1:19-cv-322. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose and Chief Judge J. Randal Hall (Southern District of Georgia) on 8/12/2019. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (jlr)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Designation of United States District Judge William T. Moore, District Judge in the Southern District of Georgia, for Service in the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Judge Circuit Judge Ed Carnes. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (jlr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to Clerk requesting docket sheet filed by Gabriel Bush. (meh) Copy of docket sheet mailed to plaintiff.
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Upon review of the complaint, the undersigned and all other judges of this District Court, acting sua sponte, recuse themselves from consideration of same pursuant to 28:455(a). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 07/19/2019. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Request for Production of Documents filed by Gabriel Bush. (Referred to MJ/Nelson(PSU) on 7/8/19) (tot)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Interrogatories filed by Gabriel Bush. (Referred to MJ/Nelson(PSU) on 7/8/19) (tot)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gabriel Bush. (Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson(PSU) on 7/8/19). (tot)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gary Anderson, Kelly Anderson, City of Ocean Springs, Mark S. Dunston, Timothy Shane Gilliam, William Jackson, Carl Johnson, Krista Kuykendall, Barbara LNU filed by Gabriel Bush. (Referred to MJ/Nelson(PSU) on 7/8/19) (tot)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Complaint by Gabriel Bush. (Referred to MJ/Nelson(PSU) on 7/19/19) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. William Jackson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Shane Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Dunston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krista Kuykendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ocean Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?