Palmer v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: Allen B. Palmer
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association, Seterus and Sirote & Permutt, PC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00335
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Remand to Circuit Court of Mobile County, AL as set out. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/27/19. (cmj)
August 22, 2019 REFERRAL OF #15 Consent to Motion to Remand and #14 Consent to Motion to Remand to Judge Steele. (cmj)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 Consent to MOTION re: #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sirote & Permutt, PC. (Monaghan, Barney)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 Consent to MOTION re: #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Seterus, Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Knight, Griffin)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order extending the deadlines for the #4 Motion to Remand. Responses due by 8/22/2019, Replies due by 8/29/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/14/2019. (tgw)
August 14, 2019 REFERRAL OF #12 Response to Judge Steele. (tgw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #11 Response filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Knight, Griffin)
August 13, 2019 REFERRAL OF #11 Response to Judge Steele. (srd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Allen B. Palmer. (Bedsole, Billy)
August 9, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Steele. (srd)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Sirote & Permutt, P.C. as Defendant filed by Allen B. Palmer. (Bedsole, Billy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Allen B. Palmer. (Bedsole, Billy)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/9/2019, Replies due by 8/16/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/26/2019. (tgw)
July 26, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Sirote & Permutt, P.C. as Defendant to Judge Steele (tgw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Sirote & Permutt, P.C. as Defendant filed by Sirote & Permutt, PC. (Monaghan, Barney)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re: #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Allen B. Palmer. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2019. Replies due by 8/15/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on 8/15/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 07/26/2019. (srd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Barney A. Monaghan on behalf of Sirote & Permutt, PC (Monaghan, Barney)
July 25, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court to Judge Steele (nah)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Allen B. Palmer. (Bedsole, Billy)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 07/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Seterus. (Knight, Griffin)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Seterus, Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC from Mobile Circuit, case number CV-2019-901521. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2426297, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Seterus, Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit C - State Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Knight, Griffin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Griffin Lane Knight
Represented By: Gregory C. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Griffin Lane Knight
Represented By: Gregory C. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seterus
Represented By: Griffin Lane Knight
Represented By: Gregory C. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirote & Permutt, PC
Represented By: Griffin Lane Knight
Represented By: Barney A. Monaghan
Represented By: Gregory C. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen B. Palmer
Represented By: Billy C. Bedsole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?