In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg et al
Petitioner: In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg and In the Matter of Hedi Heningburg
Intervenor: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Lee Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Claimant: William Whitehall, Dennis Pilarczyk, Grand Mariner Marina and Sam Williams
Case Number: 1:2019cv00341
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED ORDER granting #42 Petitioners' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time of 14 days within which to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/6/19. (gcp)
September 5, 2019 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 Answer to Complaint, #25 Answer to Complaint, #27 Answer to Complaint, #26 Answer to Complaint by Petitioners filed by In the Matter of Hedi Heningburg, In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg. (Mescolotto, Andrew)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/30/2019. (DuBose, Kristi)
August 22, 2019 Filing 40 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability, by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marine Invoice, #2 Exhibit Policy Declaration Page, #3 Exhibit Post-fire pictures) (Teague, Alto)
August 22, 2019 Filing 39 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Disclosure Statement #36 filed by Grand Mariner Marina. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (gcp)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER on #36 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Grand Mariner Marina. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/22/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
August 21, 2019 Filing 37 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to all non-filing/non-appearing parties. (nah)
August 21, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Claimant Grand Mariner Marina. (Eiland, William)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #34 Disclosure Statement filed by Grand Mariner Marina: The disclosure statement does not comply with S.D. Ala. Civil Local Rule 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties"), whose disclosure requirements are broader than those in Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 advisory committees note to 2002 adoption ("Rule 7.1 does not prohibit local rules that require disclosures in addition to those required by Rule 7.1."). Grand Mariner Marina is ORDERED to file an amended disclosure statement that fully complies with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 no later than Mon. 8/26/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/21/2019. (ctn)
August 21, 2019 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Claimant Grand Mariner Marina. (Eiland, William)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Grand Mariner Marina is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (if it is a "nongovernmental corporate" party) and S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Thurs. 8/22/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/16/2019. (ctn)
August 16, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #31 MOTION for Default Judgment as to (Clerk's Default) Against All Persons and Entities Who Did Not File Either an Answer or a Claim by August 15, 2019 as Required by Court Order [DE 5] to Judge DuBose (nah)
August 16, 2019 Filing 32 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Disclosure Statement #22 filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (gcp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 31 Application for Entry of Clerk's Default Against All Persons and Entities Who Did Not File Either an Answer or a Claim by August 15, 2019 as Required by Court Order [DE 5] filed by In the Matter of Hedi Heningburg, In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg. (Mescolotto, Andrew) Modified on 8/21/2019 (nah).
August 15, 2019 Filing 30 Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company as Subrogee of Terri Carrier's ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy Declaration Page, #2 Exhibit MR Marine Invoice, #3 Exhibit Pictures of Vessel post fire) (Teague, Alto)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
August 15, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint by William Whitehall. (McCrory, Marcus)
August 15, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Grand Mariner Marina. (Eiland, William)
August 15, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sam Williams. (Eiland, William)
August 15, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dennis Pilarczyk. (Eiland, William)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER on #22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/14/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #21 MOTION to Intervene filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company: any opposition thereto shall be filed on or before August 28, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/14/19. (gcp)
August 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #21 MOTION to Intervene to Judge DuBose (nah)
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Intervenor Parties Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.. (Teague, Alto)
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Intervene filed by Lee Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Teague, Alto)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order GRANTING #19 Unopposed MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE PUBLICATION AND MAILING REQUIREMENTS OF DE 16 AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE RE: ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE [DE 5]. The Court RESCINDS the #16 Supplemental Order and #17 Notice, and the August 15, 2019 deadline remains intact. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/06/2019. (Copy to USM) (nah)
August 6, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 Unopposed MOTION MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE PUBLICATION AND MAILING REQUIREMENTS OF DE 16 AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE RE: ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE [DE 5] to Judge DuBose (nah)
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE PUBLICATION AND MAILING REQUIREMENTS OF DE 16 AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE RE: ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE [DE 5] filed by In the Matter of Hedi Heningburg, In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Evidence of Publication, #2 Exhibit B - Evidence of Mailing Notice) (Mescolotto, Andrew)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 Remark: USMS confirmation of delivery re #17 Notice to Claimants (nah)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 RESCINDED NOTICE to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability (nah) (Rescinded, see Order, Doc. 20) Modified on 8/6/2019 (nah).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESCINDED Supplemental Order Restraining Suits, Approving Limitation Plaintiff's Security, Directing Issue of Notice and the Filing of Claims. Claims due 9/6/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/05/2019. (nah) (Rescinded, see Order, Doc. 20) Modified on 8/6/2019 (nah).
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE of Order and Notice to Claimants served 07/22/2019 as to Terri Carrier (nah)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of Order and Notice to Claimants served 07/17/2019 as to William Whitehall (nah)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of Order and Notice to Claimants served 07/16/2019 as to Dennis Pilarczyk (nah)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE of Order and Notice to Claimants served 07/16/2019 as to Grand Mariner Marina (nah)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deposit of Funds Into Court Registry by In the Matter of Hedi Heningburg, In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Receipt) (nah)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 07/17/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
July 16, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew N. Mescolotto to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew N. Mescolotto to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2431779, Online Credit Card Payment.) by In the Matter of Hedi Heningburg, In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing) (Mescolotto, Andrew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Remark: USMS confirmation of delivery and certified mail receipts re #5 Order and #7 Notice to Claimants (nah)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability (nah)
July 15, 2019 REFERRAL OF #6 Notice to Claimants to Judge DuBose. (nah)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by In the Matter of Hedi Heningburg, In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Limitation of Liability (Hitson, Kenneth)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Restraining Suits, Approving Limitation Plaintiff's Security, Directing Issue of Notice and the Filing of Claims. Claims due 8/15/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 07/12/2019. (nah)
July 10, 2019 REFERRAL OF #2 Ad Interim Stipulation, #3 Notice of Filing Exhibits - Declaration of Value, #4 Notice of Filing Exhibits - Declaration of No Pending Freight to Judge DuBose. (nah)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Declaration of No Pending Freight by In the Matter of Hedi Heningburg, In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg re: #2 Ad Interim Stipulation (Hitson, Kenneth)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Declaration of Value by In the Matter of Hedi Heningburg, In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg re: #2 Ad Interim Stipulation (Hitson, Kenneth)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 AD INTERIM STIPULATION for Value and Costs filed by In the Matter of Hedi Heningburg, In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg (Hitson, Kenneth)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability ( Filing fee $400 Receipt Number AALSDC-2427663, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg, In the Matter of Hedi Heningburg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hitson, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In the Matter of Pierce Heningburg
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Nicholas Mescolotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In the Matter of Hedi Heningburg
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Nicholas Mescolotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Alto Lee Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lee Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: William Whitehall
Represented By: Marcus McCrory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dennis Pilarczyk
Represented By: William Thomas Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Grand Mariner Marina
Represented By: William Thomas Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sam Williams
Represented By: William Thomas Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?