Thomas v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cherisse Thomas
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00342
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 07/17/2019 as to U.S. Attorney General (nah)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Lee Wiseman on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Wiseman, Holly)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 07/15/2019 as to Social Security Administration (nah)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 7/16/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (nah)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 07/11/2019. (nah)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (nah)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to serve the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 07/11/2019. (nah)
July 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kimberly Cherisse Thomas. (McPhillips, Rose)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Kimberly Cherisse Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (McPhillips, Rose) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/11/2019) (nah). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cherisse Thomas
Represented By: Rose A. McPhillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?