Stacey v. Fountain et al
Plaintiff: Marcus W. Stacey
Defendant: COI Penn, Lt. Norman, Lt. Smith, Sgt. Brasswell, COI Finch, Lt. Fountain, COI Brown and COI Rush
Case Number: 1:2019cv00373
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to withhold service of process until further notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 08/05/2019. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff on 8/6/19) (nah)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marcus W. Stacey - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (nah)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 1983 COMPLAINT against Sgt. Brasswell, COI Brown, COI Finch, Lt. Fountain, Lt. Norman, COI Penn, COI Rush, Lt. Smith, filed by Marcus W. Stacey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) - Ref to MJ/Murray (PSU) (nah)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Plaintiff to complete and file this Court's form for a complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983 and for a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees by 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 07/16/2019. (Copy of Order, 1983 Complaint Form and IFP Form mailed to Plaintiff as directed) (nah)
July 15, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Marcus W. Stacey - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (nah)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00370. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 15, 2019 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (cnw) (cnw, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER: 1) The magistrate judge's #3 recommendation is adopted; 2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 USC 1406(a); DIRECTING the clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/15/2019. (cnw, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]
July 15, 2019 No objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1406(a); Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/21/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Marcus W. Stacey. (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Sgt. Brasswell, COI Brown, COI Finch, Lt. Fountain, Lt. Norman, COI Penn, COI Rush, Lt. Smith, filed by Marcus W. Stacey.(bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stacey v. Fountain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COI Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Brasswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COI Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COI Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COI Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus W. Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?