Williams v. Saul
Plaintiff: David L. Williams
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00412
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Lee Wiseman on behalf of Andrew Saul (Wiseman, Holly)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/7/2019. (tgw)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorney's Office. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #4 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, in light of the Plaintiff's subsequent payment of the filing fee #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/7/2019. (ctn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 46031051132 (tgw)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order directing Plaintiff to either pay the $400 filing fee or file a second IFP motion by 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/25/2019. (tgw)
July 24, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David L. Williams. (Holland, Laura) Modified on 7/24/2019 (nah).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Plaintiff to, no later than 8/6/2019, either pay the $400 filing fee or file an amended IFP motion that corrects the aforementioned defect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 07/23/2019. (nah)
July 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David L. Williams. (Holland, Laura)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( IFP.), filed by David L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (Holland, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Williams
Represented By: Laura Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?