Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. v. Epic Hedron et al
Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.
Defendant: Epic Companies, LLC, Epic Hedron and Epic Diving and Marine Services LLC
Not Yet Classified: Global Maritime
Intervenor Plaintiff: Taylors International Services, Inc., Oceanwide Texas, Inc., Oceanwide Cyprus, Ltd., Fugro USA Marine, Inc., Versabar, Inc. and DHD Offshore Services, LLC
Claimant: Epic Applied Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00413
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 REFERRAL OF #70 Suggestion of Bankruptcy, to Judge Steele. (cmj)
September 10, 2019 Filing 70 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Epic Diving and Marine Services, LLC, Epic Companies, LLC, Epic Applied Technologies, LLC by Epic Diving and Marine Services LLC, Epic Applied Technologies, LLC, Epic Companies, LLC. (Rebarchak, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 69 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #68 filed by Taylors International Services, Inc. (Steele, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Taylors International Services, Inc., Trellech, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Trellech, Ltd. for Taylors International Services, Inc... (Betbeze, Jaime)
September 3, 2019 Answer due from Epic Diving and Marine Services LLC pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (cmj)
September 3, 2019 Answer due from Epic Companies, LLC pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (cmj)
September 3, 2019 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on Epic Diving & Marine Services, LLC on 08/23/2019, filed by DHD Offshore Services, LLC. (Guy, Matthew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on Epic Companies, LLC on 08/22/2019, filed by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Guy, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DISMISSING Intervenor Plaintiff DHD Offshore Services, LLC re: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #58 . Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/19. (cmj)
August 28, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE by Epic Applied Technologies, LLC of Filing Ship Release Bond (Rebarchak, James)
August 28, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE by Epic Applied Technologies, LLC of Filing Ship Release Bond (Rebarchak, James)
August 28, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE by Epic Applied Technologies, LLC of Filing Ship Release Bond (Rebarchak, James)
August 28, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE by Epic Applied Technologies, LLC of Filing Ship Release Bond (Rebarchak, James)
August 28, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE by Epic Applied Technologies, LLC of Filing Ship Release Bond (Rebarchak, James)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Leave to File Ship Release Bonds. Epic Applied Technologies, LLC is granted leave to file the Ship Release Bonds attached to the Motion as set out. EPIC HEDRON shall be released from arrest in accordance with Supplemental Rule E(5). Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/28/19. (cmj)
August 28, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DHD Offshore Services, LLC (Stevens, Scott)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order re: #53 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Ship Release Bonds filed by Epic Applied Technologies, LLC directing Epic Applied Technologies to supplement this Motion with a statement of whether DHD Offshore consents to release of the vessel and whether defendant seeks to file a ship release bond as to DHD Offshore's claim. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 9/27/19. (cmj)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Issuance of Arrest Warrant provided that DHD furnish the Clerk with a proposed form of warrant as set out. A copy of this Order is to be attached to and served with the process of maritime arrest. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/27/19. (cmj)
August 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #53 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Ship Release Bonds to Judge Steele (cmj)
August 26, 2019 Filing 54 CLAIM Verified Claim of Owner by Epic Applied Technologies, LLC. (Rebarchak, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Ship Release Bonds filed by Epic Applied Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of No Opposition, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Ship Release Bond, #4 Ship Release Bond, #5 Ship Release Bond, #6 Ship Release Bond, #7 Ship Release Bond) (Rebarchak, James)
August 26, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #52 MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant to Judge Steele (cmj)
August 26, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant filed by DHD Offshore Services, LLC. (Stevens, Scott)
August 26, 2019 Filing 51 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by DHD Offshore Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Stevens, Scott)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying as Moot #49 Motion for Issuance of Arrest Warrant as set out. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 08/21/2019. (srd)
August 21, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #49 MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant to Judge Steele. (srd)
August 21, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant by Versabar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Warrant) (Radcliff, Donald)
August 16, 2019 Filing 55 USMS Confirmation of Delivery of #48 Admiralty Warrant. Document delivered 8/16/2019. (tgw)
August 16, 2019 Filing 48 Supplemental Admiralty Warrant Issued as to as to Fugro USA Marine, Inc. (Copies to USM) (tgw)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem in favor of Fugro. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/15/2019. (tgw)
August 14, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #46 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem to Judge Steele. (srd)
August 14, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by Fugro USA Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Warrant) (Beckmann, Paul)
August 14, 2019 Filing 45 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Fugro USA Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Beckmann, Paul)
August 14, 2019 Filing 44 Summons Issued as to Epic Companies, LLC & Epic Diving and Marine Services LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
August 14, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. Epic Diving & Marine Services LLC (Guy, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. Epic Companies (Guy, Matthew)
August 13, 2019 REFERRAL OF #41 Intervenor Complaint to Judge Steele. (srd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 41 Amended Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Versabar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit Rundle) (Radcliff, Donald)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order GRANTING #39 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint in Intervention filed by Versabar, Inc. Versabar is ORDERED to file a freestanding pleading its First Amended Answer on or before 8/19/2019 as set out. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 08/12/2019. (srd)
August 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #39 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint in Intervention. Referred to Judge Steele. (srd)
August 12, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint in Intervention filed by Versabar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint in Intervention, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Radcliff, Donald)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Matthew Guy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/05/2019. (ktw)
August 5, 2019 REFERRAL OF #37 Notice of filing Certificate of Good Standing re: 34 MOTION and APPLICATION for Matthew Guy to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Judge Bivins. (tgw)
August 2, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of filing Certificate of Good Standing re: #34 MOTION and APPLICATION for Matthew Guy to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. (Guy, Matthew) Modified on 8/5/2019 (tgw).
July 31, 2019 Filing 36 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #35 filed by Versabar, Inc. (Steele, William)
July 31, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Versabar, Inc.. (Radcliff, Donald)
July 30, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #34 MOTION and APPLICATION for Matthew Guy to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (tgw)
July 30, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION and APPLICATION for Matthew Guy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2441457, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Guy, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 33 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #32 filed by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. (Steele, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Dan Bunkering (America) Inc., A/S Dan Bunkering Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent A/S Dan Bunkering Ltd. for Dan Bunkering (America) Inc... (Townsend, Neal)
July 29, 2019 Filing 31 Supplemental Admiralty Warrant Issued as to Versabar, Inc. (Copies to USM) (tgw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2019: #1 USM Confirmation of Delivery) (tgw).
July 29, 2019 Filing 30 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Versabar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices, #2 Supplement - Affidavit) (Radcliff, Donald)
July 29, 2019 Filing 29 Supplemental Admiralty Warrant Issued as to Taylors International Services, Inc. (Copies to USM) (tgw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2019: #1 USM Confirmation of Delivery) (tgw).
July 29, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake T. Richardson on behalf of Oceanwide Cyprus, Ltd., Oceanwide Texas, Inc. (Richardson, Blake)
July 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. TheClerk of Court is directed to issue a supplemental Warrant for Arrest in favor of Taylors International. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/27/2019. (tgw)
July 27, 2019 Filing 25 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #22 filed by Oceanwide Cyprus, Ltd. ; Oceanwide Texas, Inc. (Steele, William)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying as unnecessary the #16 Motion for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention. Versabar is ordered to file the Complaint in Intervention appended to its motion. The #19 Motion for Issuance of Warrant and Arrest is granted. The Clerk is directed to issue a supplemental Warrant for Arrest. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/26/2019. (tgw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem Motion for Issuance of Order for Warrant for Arrest by Taylors International Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Arrest, FRCP Rule C(2)(a), #2 Attachment to Proposed Order - Warrant for Arrest In Rem) (Betbeze, Jaime)
July 26, 2019 Filing 23 Intervenor COMPLAINT Verified Complaint in Intervention, filed by Taylors International Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Betbeze, Jaime)
July 26, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Oceanwide Cyprus, Ltd., Oceanwide Texas, Inc.. (Kavanagh, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 21 Supplemental Admiralty Warrant for Re-arrest in Rem Issued as to Epic Hedron and delivered to USM. (jlr)
July 26, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION to Intervene, #17 Proposed Order & #19 MOTION for Order and Warrant to Judge Steele (tgw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM-285 Vessel Arrest served 7/24/2019 as to EPIC HEDRON. (skb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Order and Warrant by Versabar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Warrant) (Radcliff, Donald)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 (Duplicate of Doc. 17) Proposed Order to Intervene by Versabar, Inc.. (Radcliff, Donald) Modified on 7/26/2019 (tgw).
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Order to Intervene by Versabar, Inc.. (Radcliff, Donald) Modified on 7/26/2019 (tgw).
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Intervene by Versabar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in Intervention) (Radcliff, Donald)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Global Maritime appointed. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 07/24/2019. (Copy to USM) (nah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2019: #1 USM Confirmation of Delivery) (nah).
July 24, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian Amended & REFERRAL OF #14 Notice of filing Proposed Order to Judge Steele. (nah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. re: #13 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian Amended (Townsend, Neal)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian Amended filed by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Townsend, Neal)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Oceanwide Cyprus, Ltd., Oceanwide Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Oceanwides Invoices) (Kavanagh, John)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Custodian without prejudice. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 07/23/2019. (nah)
July 23, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian & REFERRAL OF #10 Notice of filing Proposed Order to Judge Steele. (nah)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. re: #9 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian (Townsend, Neal)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian filed by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration) (Townsend, Neal)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Admiralty Warrant Issued as to Epic Hedron. (Copies to USM) (nah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2019: #1 USM Confirmation of Delivery) (nah).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Permit Cargo and Repair Operations and Movement of Vessel. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 07/23/2019. (nah)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Arrest Warrant. It is hereby ordered that the Clerk of Court issue a Warrant for the Arrest of the EPIC HEDRON, her engines, rigging, tackle, equipment furnishings, and fixtures. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 07/23/2019. (nah)
July 22, 2019 REFERRAL OF #4 Notice of filing Proposed Order, #5 Notice of filing Proposed Order, to Judge Steele. (nah)
July 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 Emergency MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant , #3 Emergency MOTION to Shift Vessel and/or Permit Movement to Judge Steele (nah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. re: #3 Emergency MOTION to Shift Vessel and/or Permit Movement (Townsend, Neal)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. re: #2 Emergency MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant (Townsend, Neal)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION to Shift Vessel and/or Permit Movement by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Townsend, Neal)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Townsend, Neal)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2434789, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4) (Townsend, Neal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. v. Epic Hedron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Companies, LLC
Represented By: James Rebarchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Hedron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Diving and Marine Services LLC
Represented By: James Rebarchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Townsend
Represented By: Matthew C. Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Global Maritime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Taylors International Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze
Represented By: Thomas S Rue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Oceanwide Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Blake T. Richardson
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Oceanwide Cyprus, Ltd.
Represented By: Blake T. Richardson
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Fugro USA Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Versabar, Inc.
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: DHD Offshore Services, LLC
Represented By: Scott D. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Epic Applied Technologies, LLC
Represented By: James Rebarchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?