Etheredge v. National General Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: George Weldon Etheridge, Jr. and George Weldon Etheredge, Jr.
Defendant: National General Insurance Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00422
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by National General Insurance Company recommending the Court sua sponte remand this case to the Circuit Court of Mobile County for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/27/19. (cmj)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by National General Insurance Company and #4 Notice filed by National General Insurance Company. Parties are permitted until 8/23/2019 to file and serve any briefing and other materials they deem necessary to demonstrate why a recommendation for this case to be remanded should not be entered as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/09/2019. (srd)
August 8, 2019 REFERRAL OF #4 Amended Notice of Removal to Judge Beaverstock. (tgw)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by National General Insurance Company Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Answer, #3 Exhibit 3-Business Records (Integon), #4 Exhibit 4-Business Records (State Farm), #5 Exhibit 5-Amended Notice of Removal_State Court) (Hitson, Kenneth)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order directing National General to file an amended Notice of Removal by 8/8/2019 and file a Disclosure Statement by 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/1/2019. (tgw)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National General Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Mobile County, case number CV-2019-901443. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2438469, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by National General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- State Court File, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Admission, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Notice of Removal_State Court) (Hitson, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etheredge v. National General Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National General Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Charles Alexander, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.
Represented By: Mark R. Ulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Weldon Etheridge, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Preston McClurkin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Weldon Etheredge, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Preston McClurkin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?